District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O. v. Sahara Construction Corp.
Petitioner: District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O.
Respondent: Sahara Construction Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10155
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summary Motion served on Sahara Construction Corp. on 1/26/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O...(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 22, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O...(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 22, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O...(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of John Drew in Support re: #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O...(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O...(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition and Summons served on Sahara Construction Corp. on 12/7/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O...(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sahara Construction Corp...(jgo)
December 4, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 4, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 4, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Lauren Kugielska in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Decision & Award, #2 Exhibit B-CBA, #3 Exhibit C-Demand for Arbitration, #4 Exhibit D-Decision Cover Letter, #5 Exhibit E-Demand Letter).(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O...(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sahara Construction Corp., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O...(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22866905).Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Memorandum of Law).(Kugielska, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O. v. Sahara Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sahara Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.- C.I.O.
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kugielska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?