Pochinsky v. Standard AVB Financial Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Philip A. Pochinsky
Defendant: Timothy K. Zimmerman, Terence L. Graft, Gregory J. Saxon, David C. Mathews, Dale A. Walker, Standard AVB Financial Corp., Jennifer H. Lunden, Andrew W. Hasley, John M. Lally, Thomas J. Rennie, William T. Ferri, Ronald J. Mock, Paul A. Iurlano and R. Craig Thomasmeyer
Case Number: 1:2020cv10176
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) William T. Ferri, Terence L. Graft, Andrew W. Hasley, Paul A. Iurlano, John M. Lally, Jennifer H. Lunden, David C. Mathews, Ronald J. Mock, Thomas J. Rennie, Gregory J. Saxon, Standard AVB Financial Corp., R. Craig Thomasmeyer, Dale A. Walker, Timothy K. Zimmerman. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Timothy K. Zimmerman waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Dale A. Walker waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. R. Craig Thomasmeyer waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Standard AVB Financial Corp. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gregory J. Saxon waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Thomas J. Rennie waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ronald J. Mock waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David C. Mathews waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jennifer H. Lunden waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. John M. Lally waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Paul A. Iurlano waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Andrew W. Hasley waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Terence L. Graft waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. William T. Ferri waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 4, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 4, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 4, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Monteverde, Juan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William T. Ferri, Terence L. Graft, Andrew W. Hasley, Paul A. Iurlano, John M. Lally, Jennifer H. Lunden, David C. Mathews, Ronald J. Mock, Thomas J. Rennie, Gregory J. Saxon, Standard AVB Financial Corp., R. Craig Thomasmeyer, Dale A. Walker, Timothy K. Zimmerman. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22871328)Document filed by Philip A. Pochinsky..(Monteverde, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pochinsky v. Standard AVB Financial Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy K. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence L. Graft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Saxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard AVB Financial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer H. Lunden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew W. Hasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Lally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Rennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald J. Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Iurlano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Craig Thomasmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip A. Pochinsky
Represented By: Juan Eneas Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?