Rubin v. New York City Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Lise Rubin
Defendant: Henry Bluestone Smith, Christine Novak, Alexis Lantzounis, Michael Biscogna, New York City Special Commission of Investigation, Darnell Young, Howard Friedman, Julia Busetti, M009 teacher Cowan, Katherine Witzke, Ilene Altschul, Toni Gantz, Anastasia Coleman, Joseph A. Baranello, Ilene Lees, New York City Board of Education, Daniel Schlachet, Susan Epstein, Katherine G. Rodi, Esq. and Michael van Biema
Case Number: 1:2020cv10208
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held on March 11, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. Any party who has retained counsel prior to the conference need not personally attend and should instead have their attorney attend on their behalf. The Court will issue an order providing the dial-in information for the conference. By the date of the initial pretrial conference, counsel for any represented party is required to register as a filing user on ECF. The Clerk of Court shall mail the following documents in addition to the IPTC order to the Plaintiff: a. Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing, at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/motion-for-permission-for-electronic case-filing-for-pro-se-cases. b. Pro Se (Nonprisoner) Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically, at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/consent-to-electronic service-for-pro-se-cases. The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/29/2021) (kv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 29, 2021 Mailed a copy of #7 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Lise Rubin at 677 Kent Ave, Teaneck, NJ 0766. (dsh)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INFORMATION SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Lise Rubin 677 Kent Ave Teaneck, NJ 07666 on 01/05/2021 Re: #4 Order of Service via MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 20 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (ta)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ilene Altschul, Joseph A. Baranello, Michael Biscogna, Julia Busetti, Anastasia Coleman, Cowan, Susan Epstein, Howard Friedman, Toni Gantz, Alexis Lantzounis, Ilene Lees, New York City Board of Education, New York City Special Commission of Investigation, Christine Novak, Katherine G. Rodi, Esq, Daniel Schlachet, Henry Bluestone Smith, Katherine Witzke, Darnell Young, Michael van Biema. (ta)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants: New York City Board of Education; New York City Special Commission of Investigation; Anastasia Coleman; Daniel Schlachet; Michael Biscogna; Susan Epstein; Katherine Witzke; Ilene Altschul; Howard Friedman; Henry Bluestone Smith; Joseph A. Baranello; Toni Gantz; Ilene Lees; Christine Novak; Julia Busetti; Michael van Biema; Darnell Young; Alexis Lantzounis; Katherine G. Rodi; and M009 Teacher Cowan. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summonses. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendants or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/4/2021) (nb) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
December 29, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
December 29, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
December 21, 2020 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 12/21/2020, Receipt Number 465401270901. (jgl)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Lise Rubin. (sac)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ilene Altschul, Joseph A. Baranello, Michael Biscogna, Julia Busetti, Anastasia Coleman, Cowan, Susan Epstein, Howard Friedman, Toni Gantz, Alexis Lantzounis, Ilene Lees, New York City Board of Education, New York City Special Commission of Investigation, Christine Novak, Katherine G. Rodi, Esq, Daniel Schlachet, Henry Bluestone Smith, Katherine Witzke, Darnell Young, Michael van Biema. Document filed by Lise Rubin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit).(sac)
December 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubin v. New York City Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Bluestone Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Lantzounis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Biscogna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Special Commission of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darnell Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Busetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M009 teacher Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Witzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Altschul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Gantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anastasia Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Baranello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Schlachet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine G. Rodi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael van Biema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lise Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?