Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 1:2020cv10382
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Phillips, Lauren)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Natural Resources Defense Council dated 1/28/2021 re: Fee waiver claim. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Phillips, Lauren)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency..(Hogan, Alexander)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Marlantes Rahm on behalf of Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Rahm, Catherine)
December 11, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 2:16-cv-01251-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 11, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Environmental Protection Agency..(pc)
December 10, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 16cv1251. (pc)
December 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Phillips, Lauren)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 16cv01251. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Phillips, Lauren)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Phillips, Lauren)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Phillips, Lauren)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22958884)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FOIA Request).(Phillips, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Alexander James Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Patricia Phillips
Represented By: Catherine Marlantes Rahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?