Pimentel Collado v. The Amber Avalon Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado
Defendant: Good Pal Ravel Corp. doing business as Ravel Hotel, 163 Hope Street LLC doing business as The Regal Diner and Cocktail Bar, Seth Levine, Ravi Patel, The Amber Avalon Corp. doing business as Hotel Chantelle, Ravel Hotel LLC doing business as Ravel Hotel and Good Pal Chantelle Corp. doing business as Hotel Chantelle
Case Number: 1:2020cv10410
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Michael Collins on behalf of 163 Hope Street LLC, Good Pal Chantelle Corp., Good Pal Ravel Corp., Seth Levine, Ravi Patel, Ravel Hotel LLC, The Amber Avalon Corp...(Collins, Patrick)
January 15, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel M. Bernstein on behalf of 163 Hope Street LLC, Good Pal Chantelle Corp., Good Pal Ravel Corp., Seth Levine, Ravi Patel, Ravel Hotel LLC, The Amber Avalon Corp...(Bernstein, Daniel)
January 14, 2021 Filing 19 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by 163 Hope Street LLC, Good Pal Chantelle Corp., Good Pal Ravel Corp., Seth Levine, Ravi Patel, Ravel Hotel LLC, The Amber Avalon Corp...(Bernstein, Daniel)
December 11, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Amber Avalon Corp...(jgo)
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Seth Levine..(jgo)
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ravi Patel..(jgo)
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ravel Hotel LLC..(jgo)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Good Pal Ravel Corp...(jgo)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Good Pal Chantelle Corp...(jgo)
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 163 Hope Street LLC..(jgo)
December 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Louis Pechman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Galen C. Baynes on behalf of Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado..(Baynes, Galen)
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29. U.S.C. 201. Document filed by Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado..(Pechman, Louis)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Seth Levine, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado..(Pechman, Louis)
December 10, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ravi Patel, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado..(Pechman, Louis)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 163 Hope Street LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado..(Pechman, Louis)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ravel Hotel LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado..(Pechman, Louis)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Good Pal Ravel Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado..(Pechman, Louis)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Good Pal Chantelle Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado..(Pechman, Louis)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Amber Avalon Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado..(Pechman, Louis)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pechman, Louis)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 163 Hope Street LLC, Good Pal Chantelle Corp., Good Pal Ravel Corp., Seth Levine, Ravi Patel, Ravel Hotel LLC, The Amber Avalon Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22973170)Document filed by Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado..(Pechman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pimentel Collado v. The Amber Avalon Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Antonio Pimentel Collado
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Galen C. Baynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Pal Ravel Corp. doing business as Ravel Hotel
Represented By: Patrick Michael Collins
Represented By: Daniel M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 163 Hope Street LLC doing business as The Regal Diner and Cocktail Bar
Represented By: Patrick Michael Collins
Represented By: Daniel M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Levine
Represented By: Patrick Michael Collins
Represented By: Daniel M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravi Patel
Represented By: Patrick Michael Collins
Represented By: Daniel M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Amber Avalon Corp. doing business as Hotel Chantelle
Represented By: Patrick Michael Collins
Represented By: Daniel M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravel Hotel LLC doing business as Ravel Hotel
Represented By: Patrick Michael Collins
Represented By: Daniel M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Pal Chantelle Corp. doing business as Hotel Chantelle
Represented By: Patrick Michael Collins
Represented By: Daniel M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?