Burns v. Scott et al
Plaintiff: Robert Burns
Defendant: Shift Hospital, LLC and Gabriel Scott
Case Number: 1:2020cv10518
Filed: December 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2021 at 12:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Gabriel Scott, Shift Hospital, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Robert Burns. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Chen, Hui)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gabriel Scott, Shift Hospital, LLC..(gp)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Gabriel Scott, Shift Hospital, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Robert Burns. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Chen, Hui) Modified on 12/14/2020 (gp).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hui Chen to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Hui Chen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robert Burns. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (gp)
December 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gabriel Scott, and Shift Hospitality LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Burns..(Chen, Hui)
December 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Chen, Hui)
December 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gabriel Scott, Shift Hospital, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23007176)Document filed by Robert Burns..(Chen, Hui)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shift Hospital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Burns
Represented By: Hui Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?