Immigrant Defense Project et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Center for Constitutional Rights and Immigrant Defense Project
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2020cv10625
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Sun, Anthony)
January 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Jan-Huan Sun on behalf of United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Sun, Anthony)
January 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ghita Schwarz on behalf of Center for Constitutional Rights, Immigrant Defense Project..(Schwarz, Ghita)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/20/2021; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights; Immigrant Defense Project..(Kang, Leila)
December 18, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(dnh)
December 18, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security..(dnh)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on March 5, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. This conference will be held via telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than February 26, 2021, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. Plaintiffs are ordered to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/18/2020) (ama)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leila Kang to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leila Kang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23083749. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Immigrant Defense Project. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Leila Kang, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Kang, Leila)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Immigrant Defense Project..(Wachtenheim, Andrew)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Immigrant Defense Project..(Wachtenheim, Andrew)
December 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
December 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew Brian Wachtenheim. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
December 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
December 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Andrew Brian Wachtenheim to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the name of the party as to whom the summons is being requested must be listed in the as to docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 17, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Leila Kang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23083749. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Immigrant Defense Project..(Wachtenheim, Andrew) Modified on 12/17/2020 (dnh).
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Immigrant Defense Project..(Wachtenheim, Andrew) Modified on 12/17/2020 (dnh).
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wachtenheim, Andrew)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23063514)Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Immigrant Defense Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Wachtenheim, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immigrant Defense Project et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Anthony Jan-Huan Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Anthony Jan-Huan Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Constitutional Rights
Represented By: Andrew Brian Wachtenheim
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Leila Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immigrant Defense Project
Represented By: Andrew Brian Wachtenheim
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Leila Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?