Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund et al v. National Window Film
Petitioner: Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O. and Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund
Respondent: National Window Film a/k/a National Window Film LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv10653
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summary Judgment served on National Window Film on 1/27/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 27, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 27, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of John Drew in Support re: #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition and Summons served on National Window Film on 12/23/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Return Receipt).(Kugielska, Lauren)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition and Summons served on National Window Film on 12/21/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Order served on National Window Film on 12/22/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 2/26/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/18/2020) (kv)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Window Film a/k/a National Window Film LLC..(pc)
December 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rider).(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Window Film a/k/a National Window Film LLC, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rider).(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund..(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Lauren Kugielska in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Decision & Award, #2 Exhibit B-Glaziers Agreement, #3 Exhibit C-CBA, #4 Exhibit D-Charges, #5 Exhibit E-Decision Cover Letter, #6 Exhibit F-Demand Letter).(Kugielska, Lauren)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23082907).Document filed by Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund, District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O., Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Memorandum of Law).(Kugielska, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund et al v. National Window Film
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Insurance Fund
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kugielska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: District Council No. 9 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, A.F.L.-C.I.O.
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kugielska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the District Council No. 9 Painting Industry Annuity Fund
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kugielska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: National Window Film a/k/a National Window Film LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?