Sanchez v. Casio America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christian Sanchez
Defendant: Casio America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10681
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Andrew C. Karter dated January 21, 2021. Document filed by Casio America, Inc...(Karter, Andrew)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew C Karter on behalf of Casio America, Inc...(Karter, Andrew)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on March 1, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 3/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 1/6/2021) (va)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Casio America, Inc...(jgo)
December 21, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 21, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Casio America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Casio America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23098895)Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Casio America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Sanchez
Represented By: Joseph H Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casio America, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C Karter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?