Kiner v. Webb-Walsh et al
Plaintiff: Jack Kiner
Defendant: Brian J. Webb-Walsh, Ashok Vemuri and Conduent Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv10964
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ss
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jack Kiner..(Reich, Mark)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Shane P Sanders to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Craig W Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
January 26, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Craig W. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23679555. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #14 MOTION for Shane P. Sanders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23679606. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
January 25, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Shane P. Sanders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23679606. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jack Kiner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shane P. Sanders, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Sanders, Shane)
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Craig W. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23679555. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jack Kiner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Craig W. Smith, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Smith, Craig)
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ashok Vemuri waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. Document filed by Jack Kiner..(Reich, Mark)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Brian J. Webb-Walsh waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. Document filed by Jack Kiner..(Reich, Mark)
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Conduent Incorporated waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. Document filed by Jack Kiner..(Reich, Mark)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Conduent Incorporated, Ashok Vemuri, Brian J. Webb-Walsh. Document filed by Jack Kiner..(Reich, Mark)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Conduent Incorporated..(jgo)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian J. Webb-Walsh..(jgo)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ashok Vemuri..(jgo)
December 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark Samuel Reich. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:78; County code Suffolk;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
December 29, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Samuel Reich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jack Kiner; Conduent Incorporated. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
December 29, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 29, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Conduent Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jack Kiner..(Reich, Mark)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ashok Vemuri, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jack Kiner..(Reich, Mark)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian J. Webb-Walsh, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jack Kiner..(Reich, Mark)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reich, Mark)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Conduent Incorporated, Ashok Vemuri, Brian J. Webb-Walsh. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23235849)Document filed by Jack Kiner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Litigation Demand, dated July 9, 2020, #2 Exhibit B - Letter, dated July 15, 2020, #3 Exhibit C - Letter, dated July 21, 2020, #4 Exhibit D - Letter, dated October 19, 2020).(Reich, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiner v. Webb-Walsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian J. Webb-Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashok Vemuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conduent Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Kiner
Represented By: Mark Samuel Reich
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Represented By: Craig W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?