Globalex, Inc. v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Plaintiff: Globalex, Inc.
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11127
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333ad
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. waiver sent on 1/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(dnh)
January 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
January 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
January 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
January 1, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin)
January 1, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin)
January 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin)
January 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23301437)Document filed by Globalex, Inc...(Heilig, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Globalex, Inc. v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Globalex, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Matthew Heilig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?