Lake Holding & Finance S.A.
Case Number: 1:2020mc00652
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: M 77 Application to have subpoena issued to person living in this district re: action in foreign cou

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, the Rempel's parties' amended motion to intervene, Docket Entry No. 32, is granted. On or before March 18, 2021, the Rempel parties shall serve and file any opposition to the petition. Any reply may be served and filed on or before March 25, 2021. So ordered. Granting 32 Motion to Intervene. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 3/10/2021) (rjm)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 27 AMENDED MOTION to Intervene, filed by Margarita Belyak, Anastasia Belyak, Mikhail Belyak; 30 Letter, filed by Yulia Rempel, Larisa Rempel, Garri Rempel, Igor Rempel; 29 Letter filed by Lake Holdi ng & Finance S.A. For the foregoing reasons, the Belyak parties' amended motion to intervene, Docket Entry No. 27, is granted. The petitioner's objection, Docket Entry No. 29, is overruled. The Rempel parties' request to "pe rmit the intervention on consent," Docket Entry No. 30, is denied. On or before February 23, 2021, the Belyak parties shall serve and file any opposition to the petition. Any reply may be served and filed on or before March 2, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 2/23/2021. Replies due by 3/2/2021.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 2/16/2021) (va)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: 15 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. If Respondents consent to proceed before Judge Fox, no later than January 20, 2021, the parties shall submit to the Orders & Judgments Clerk at judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov a fully exe cuted Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this Order (and also available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/consent to- proceed-before-us-magistrate-judge). If the Court appr oves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before Judge Fox rather than before me. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be from this Court if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this Order. Respondents are free to withhold consent to conducting all further proceedings before Judge Fox without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/6/2021) (kv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake Holding & Finance S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?