Cox v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: THEODORE N. COX and Theodore Cox
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf, TAE D. JOHNSON and JONATHAN FAHEY
Case Number: 1:2021cv00024
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Fahey..(dnh)
January 28, 2021 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chad F. Wolf..(dnh)
January 28, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Fahey..(dnh)
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tae D. Johnson..(dnh)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Tae D. Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Cox., REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tae D. Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Cox..(Cox, Theodore)
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Fahey, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Cox..(Cox, Theodore)
January 26, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chad F. Wolf, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Cox..(Cox, Theodore)
January 26, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Fahey, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Cox..(Cox, Theodore)
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tae D. Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Cox..(Cox, Theodore)
January 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Theodore Norwood Cox to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Use the Summons in a Civil Action (FIOA) form, NOT the standard summons form. Only parties listed on the complaint caption title can be issued a summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
January 14, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chad F. Wolf, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Cox..(Cox, Theodore) Modified on 1/15/2021 (sj).
January 14, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tae D. Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Cox..(Cox, Theodore) Modified on 1/15/2021 (sj).
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Fahey, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Cox..(Cox, Theodore) Modified on 1/15/2021 (sj).
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffery Rosen, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Theodore Cox..(Cox, Theodore) Modified on 1/15/2021 (sj).
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cox, Theodore)
January 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Theodore Norwood Cox to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Use the FIOA summons form not the standard summons form. Only parties listed on the complaint caption title can be issued a summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Theodore Norwood Cox. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JONATHAN FAHEY, TAE D. JOHNSON, Chad F. Wolf, THEODORE N. COX. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
January 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Theodore Norwood Cox. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
January 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by THEODORE N. COX..(Cox, Theodore) Modified on 1/5/2021 (pc).
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chad F. Wolf, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by THEODORE N. COX..(Cox, Theodore) Modified on 1/5/2021 (pc).
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TAE D. JOHNSON, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by THEODORE N. COX..(Cox, Theodore) Modified on 1/5/2021 (pc).
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TAE D. JOHNSON, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by THEODORE N. COX..(Cox, Theodore) Modified on 1/5/2021 (pc).
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey A. Rosen, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by THEODORE N. COX..(Cox, Theodore) Modified on 1/5/2021 (pc).
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JONATHAN FAHEY, TAE D. JOHNSON, Chad F. Wolf. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-23336583)Document filed by THEODORE N. COX..(Cox, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THEODORE N. COX
Represented By: Theodore Norwood Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Cox
Represented By: Theodore Norwood Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAE D. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN FAHEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?