Nieves v. Aerco International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joshua Nieves
Defendant: Aerco International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00175
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aerco International, Inc...(Malley, Sean)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Watts Regulator Co., Corporate Parent Watts Water Technologies, Inc. for Aerco International, Inc.. Document filed by Aerco International, Inc...(Malley, Sean)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have until February 23, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Aerco International, Inc. answer due 2/23/2021 (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 2/9/2021) (cf)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Sean Malley dated February 9, 2021. Document filed by Aerco International, Inc...(Malley, Sean)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Aerco International, Inc. served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. Service was accepted by Scott Kuntz (CT Corp. System). Document filed by Joshua Nieves..(Santagata, Justin)
January 12, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aerco International, Inc...(jgo)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: Counsel for all parties are hereby ORDERED to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on March 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. (And as further set fort herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/12/2021) (jca)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aerco International, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joshua Nieves..(Santagata, Justin)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Santagata, Justin)
January 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Justin Santagata to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Justin Santagata. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 445 (Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 751 (Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
January 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Justin Santagata to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Do not fill out the citizenship of principal parties if Federal Question Basis of Jurisdiction is selected. Office was not selected. Civil Cover sheet was not signed. (pc)
January 11, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 11, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 11, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aerco International, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joshua Nieves..(Santagata, Justin) Modified on 1/11/2021 (pc).
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Santagata, Justin) Modified on 1/11/2021 (pc).
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aerco International, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23427361)Document filed by Joshua Nieves..(Santagata, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nieves v. Aerco International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerco International, Inc.
Represented By: Sean A Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Nieves
Represented By: Justin Santagata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?