State Of New York et al v. Wheeler et al
Plaintiff: State Of Delaware,, City Of New York, State Of Connecticut, State Of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts and State of New Jersey
Defendant: Andrew R. Wheeler and United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 1:2021cv00252
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE TO CAROL IANCU granting #16 Motion for Carol Iancu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/5/2021) (rj)
March 4, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Carol Iancu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24195258. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Iancu, Carol)
March 4, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Carol Iancu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24195258. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Douglas Wright on behalf of State Of Delaware,..(Wright, Christian)
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Valerie Satterfield Edge on behalf of State Of Delaware,..(Edge, Valerie)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 1/15/2021, answer due 3/26/2021; Andrew R. Wheeler served on 1/15/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by City Of New York; State Of New York; Commonwealth of Massachusetts; State Of Delaware,; State Of Connecticut; State of New Jersey..(Walthall, Claiborne)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 1/19/2021, answer due 3/26/2021; Andrew R. Wheeler served on 1/19/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by City Of New York; State Of New York; Commonwealth of Massachusetts; State Of Delaware,; State Of Connecticut; State of New Jersey..(Walthall, Claiborne)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by City Of New York; State Of New York; Commonwealth of Massachusetts; State Of Delaware,; State Of Connecticut; State of New Jersey..(Walthall, Claiborne)
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Andrew R. Wheeler served on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by City Of New York; State Of New York; Commonwealth of Massachusetts; State Of Delaware,; State Of Connecticut; State of New Jersey..(Walthall, Claiborne)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 MOTION for Christian Douglas Wright to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/25/2021) (jca)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 MOTION for Valerie Satterfield Edge to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/25/2021) (jca)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Christian Douglas Wright to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23647704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State Of Delaware,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Christian Wright Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Supplement Christian Wright Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Wright, Christian)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Valerie Satterfield Edge to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23646538. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State Of Delaware,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Valerie Edge Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Supplement Valerie Edge Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Edge, Valerie)
January 22, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Christian Douglas Wright to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23647704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 22, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Valerie Satterfield Edge to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23646538. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Nancy Lacedonia on behalf of State Of Connecticut..(Lacedonia, Jill)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler..(jgo)
January 13, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 13, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 13, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew R. Wheeler; United States Environmental Protection Agency, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City Of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State Of Connecticut, State Of Delaware,, State Of New York, State of New Jersey..(Walthall, Claiborne)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Walthall, Claiborne)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23473648)Document filed by City Of New York, State Of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State Of Delaware,, State Of Connecticut, State of New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Letter).(Walthall, Claiborne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Of New York et al v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of Delaware,
Represented By: Christian Douglas Wright
Represented By: Valerie Satterfield Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of Connecticut
Represented By: Jill Nancy Lacedonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of New York
Represented By: Claiborne Ellis Walthall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Carol Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?