Fremgen et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Michael Wilder and Sandra Wilde
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Hachette Book Group, Inc., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Simon & Schuster, Inc. and Penguin Random House LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00351
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: While Hagens Berman's request for appointment is currently unopposed, the Court wishes to provide an opportunity for interested persons to state their objection, if any, to such appointment. Accordingly, is HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to the appointment of Hagens Berman as interim lead counsel in the above-captioned actions shall be due no later than seven days after the entry of this order; any reply to such opposition shall be due no later than four days after the filing and service of the opposition. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/8/2021) (mro)
March 8, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION for Eamon Padraic Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24219992. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Kelly, Eamon)
March 8, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #52 MOTION for Eamon Padraic Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24219992. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 5, 2021 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Georg von Holtzbrinck GmbH & Co. KG for Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC. Document filed by Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(Mitnick, Joel)
March 5, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel M. Mitnick on behalf of Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(Mitnick, Joel)
March 4, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Michael Swenson on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Swenson, Robert)
March 4, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Leonard White on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(White, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2021 Filing 47 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate ViacomCBS Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Simon & Schuster, Inc.. Document filed by Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
March 4, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yehudah Lev Buchweitz on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
March 3, 2021 Filing 45 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bertelsmann SE & Co. KGaA for Penguin Random House LLC. Document filed by Penguin Random House LLC..(Morgenstern, Saul)
March 3, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Margaret Anne Rogers on behalf of Penguin Random House LLC..(Rogers, Margaret)
March 3, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Saul P Morgenstern on behalf of Penguin Random House LLC..(Morgenstern, Saul)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. The Court declines to endorse the parties' proposed order. Dkt No. 39. The proposed order was not accompanied by a letter as required by Rule 1(F) of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. The Court will await any objections to the proposed consolidation of the cases referenced in that order, in accordance with its February 24th order, Dkt. No. 41. Moreover, the Court does not anticipate that it will establish a briefing schedule before holding a pre-motion conference. The Court construes the parties' proposed order as a request to extend the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaints in Fremgen v. Amazon.com, et al. and each of its related cases. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to those complaints is adjourned sine die pending the resolution of the application to consolidate the cases pending before the Court and the application to appoint lead counsel for those cases. The Court anticipates that a consolidated complaint will be filed within 45 days after an order or orders consolidating the Fremgen, Sacks, Weinberger, Bonilla, Silverman, Cook and Lerner Actions and appointing interim co-lead counsel for the putative plaintiff class. The parties are again directed to review and comply with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Before the court is a motion by plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions and Amazon, a defendant in each of those actions. The parties request that the above-captioned cases be consolidated. Any opposition to the consolidation of these actions shall be due no later than ten days after the entry of this order; any reply to such opposition shall be due no later than seven days after the filing and service of the opposition. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/24/2021) (mro)
February 24, 2021 Filing 40 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent News Corporation for HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.. Document filed by HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(Lent, Charles)
February 24, 2021 Filing 39 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(Lent, Charles)
February 24, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Scott Lent on behalf of HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(Lent, Charles)
February 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #37 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
February 23, 2021 Filing 37 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. Related Document Number: #34 ..(Berman, Steve) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 23, 2021 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Steve W. Berman in Support re: #34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Unopposed Motion to Appoint Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Proposed Class.. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Berman, Steve)
February 23, 2021 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Unopposed Motion to Appoint Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Proposed Class. . Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Berman, Steve)
February 23, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Unopposed Motion to Appoint Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Proposed Class. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Berman, Steve)
February 16, 2021 Filing 33 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Amazon.com, Inc...(Pitt, Jonathan)
February 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #24 Motion for Matthew T. Slater to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned cases in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 2/13/2021) (kv)
February 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #23 Motion for Paul E. Slater to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned cases in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 2/13/2021) (kv)
February 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #22 Motion for Joseph M. Vanek to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned cases in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 2/13/2021) (kv)
February 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #16 Motion for Barbara A. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned cases in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 2/13/2021) (kv)
February 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #15 Motion for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned cases in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 2/13/2021) (kv)
February 12, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Bradley Pitt on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc...(Pitt, Jonathan)
February 12, 2021 Filing 26 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steve W. Berman, et al. dated February 12, 2021 re: Letter in support of Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation and Setting Deadlines. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
February 12, 2021 Filing 25 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
February 9, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Matthew Trace Slater to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23878842. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Affidvait, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Slater, Matthew)
February 9, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Paul Ethan Slater to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23878362. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Slater, Paul)
February 9, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Joseph Michael Vanek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23878003. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Vanek, Joseph)
February 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Joseph Michael Vanek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23878003. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Paul Ethan Slater to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23878362. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Matthew Trace Slater to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23878842. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 5, 2021 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (sj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Penguin Random House LLC. (sj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC. (sj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.. (sj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hachette Book Group, Inc.. (sj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Barbara A. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Barbara A. Mahoney, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Mahoney, Barbara)
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steve W. Berman, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Berman, Steve)
February 5, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 5, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Barbara A. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 5, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #14 MOTION for Barbara A. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23824724. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. #13 MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23824510. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The affidavits are not notarized. Re-file the corrected motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
February 4, 2021 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Barbara A. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23824724. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Barbara A. Mahoney, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Mahoney, Barbara) Modified on 2/5/2021 (aea).
February 4, 2021 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23824510. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steve W. Berman, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Berman, Steve) Modified on 2/5/2021 (aea).
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simon & Schuster, Inc., re: #7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Penguin Random House LLC, re: #7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
February 4, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, re: #7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., re: #7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hachette Book Group, Inc., re: #7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Amazon.com, Inc., Hachette Book Group, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Penguin Random House LLC, Simon & Schuster, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Shannon Fremgen, Denise DeLeon, Mary Christopherson-Juve, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent. Document filed by Shannon Fremgen; Denise DeLeon; Mary Christopherson-Juve..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/17/2021) (mro)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.com, Inc...(pc)
January 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nathaniel A. Tarnor. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Shannon Fremgen, Denise DeLeon, Mary Christopherson-Juve. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
January 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23517168)Document filed by Shannon Fremgen, Denise DeLeon, Mary Christopherson-Juve..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fremgen et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Christopherson-Juve
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Paul Ethan Slater
Represented By: Matthew Trace Slater
Represented By: Barbara Mahoney
Represented By: Eamon P. Kelly
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Joseph M Vanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise DeLeon
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Paul Ethan Slater
Represented By: Matthew Trace Slater
Represented By: Barbara Mahoney
Represented By: Eamon P. Kelly
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Joseph M Vanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Fremgen
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Paul Ethan Slater
Represented By: Matthew Trace Slater
Represented By: Barbara Mahoney
Represented By: Eamon P. Kelly
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Joseph M Vanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wilder
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Matthew Trace Slater
Represented By: Barbara Mahoney
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Wilde
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Matthew Trace Slater
Represented By: Barbara Mahoney
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Bradley Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.
Represented By: Charles Scott Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC
Represented By: Joel M. Mitnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Represented By: Yehudah Lev Buchweitz
Represented By: Jeffrey Leonard White
Represented By: Robert Michael Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Random House LLC
Represented By: Margaret Anne Rogers
Represented By: Saul P Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?