Rivera Quintanilla v. Decker et al
Petitioner: Alexis Rivera Quintanilla
Respondent: Sheriff Carl E. DuBois, Peter T Gaynor, Director Thomas Decker, Jeffrey A. Rosen and Acting Secretary Peter T Gaynor
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Thomas R. Decker and Acting US AG Jeffrey A. Rosen
Case Number: 1:2021cv00417
Filed: January 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/16/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/16/2021 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/24/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: The petition for a writ of habeas corpus, (ECF No. 1 ), is GRANTED. Within ten (10) business days from the date of this Memorandum Decision and Order, Respondents shall provide Petitioner with a constitutionally-adequate, individualized bond hearing to determine whether his detention is justified, at which the burden of proof shall lie with Respondents to prove by clear and convincing evidence that Petitioner is a flight risk or a danger to the community. The immigration judge is also hereby directed to meaningfully consider alternatives to incarceration and Petitioner's ability to pay if setting a monetary bond. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/22/2021) (jca)
February 16, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 2/16/2021 re: #2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause and for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. filed by Alexis Rivera Quintanilla. Petitioners Counsel: Edgar Loy FankbonnerRespondents Counsel: Jessica F. Rosenbaum and Court Reporter present. (Vega, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Oral argument on Petitioner's motion for an order to show cause, preliminary injunction, and temporary restraining order, (ECF No. 2), is scheduled for February 16, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. and will occur as a videoconference using the Skype platform. Co-counsel, members of the press, and the public may access the audio feed of the conference by calling (917) 933-2166 and entering the code ID 792986513. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/11/2021) ( Telephone Conference set for 2/16/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (ks)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Edgar Loy Fankbonner dated 02/09/2021 re: Reply to Respondents' Opposition. Document filed by Alexis Rivera Quintanilla..(Fankbonner, Edgar)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause and for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl E. DuBois, Peter T Gaynor, Jeffrey A. Rosen..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of GERALDO PAOLI in Opposition re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl E. DuBois, Peter T Gaynor, Jeffrey A. Rosen..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl E. DuBois, Peter T Gaynor, Jeffrey A. Rosen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit Repository Inquiry, #3 Exhibit Violation of Probation, #4 Exhibit Notice of Custody Determination, #5 Exhibit Notice to EOIR, #6 Exhibit Notice of Appeal, #7 Exhibit Notice of Hearing, #8 Exhibit Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum, #9 Exhibit Notice to EOIR).(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #5 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Thomas Decker answer due 1/26/2021; Carl E. DuBois answer due 1/26/2021; Peter T Gaynor answer due 1/26/2021; Jeffrey A. Rosen answer due 1/26/2021.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/21/2021) (jwh)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from JESSICA F. ROSENBAUM dated January 21, 2021 re: Scheduling and Request for Page Enlargement. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl E. DuBois, Peter T Gaynor, Jeffrey A. Rosen..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica F. Rosenbaum on behalf of Thomas Decker, Carl E. DuBois, Peter T Gaynor, Jeffrey A. Rosen..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fankbonner, Edgar)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause and for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Alexis Rivera Quintanilla. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney's Affirmation and Verification, #2 Exhibit IJ Order Denying Bond).(Fankbonner, Edgar)
January 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Edgar Loy Fankbonner. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
January 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edgar Loy Fankbonner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Peter T Gaynor; Thomas R. Decker; Acting US AG Jeffrey A. Rose; Carl E. DuBois. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
January 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23559328)Document filed by Alexis Rivera Quintanilla..(Fankbonner, Edgar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera Quintanilla v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alexis Rivera Quintanilla
Represented By: Edgar Loy Fankbonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Carl E. DuBois
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter T Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Thomas Decker
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey A. Rosen
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary Peter T Gaynor
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Thomas R. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Acting US AG Jeffrey A. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?