Young et al v. L'oreal USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Renee Young and Roxane Tierney
Defendant: L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00446
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katharine H Parker
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss Case. . Document filed by Roxane Tierney, Renee Young..(King, Laurence)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #61 Motion for Matthew Brian George to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/5/2021) (mro)
March 5, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #61 MOTION for Matthew Brian George to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24211209. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 5, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION for Matthew Brian George to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24211209. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roxane Tierney, Renee Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew B. George in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission).(George, Matthew)
February 25, 2021 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss Case. . Document filed by L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Visible Lift, #2 Exhibit B - Age Perfect, #3 Exhibit C -RevitaLift, #4 Exhibit D - SuperStay, #5 Exhibit E - Affirmance).(Lewis, Justin)
February 25, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss Case. Document filed by L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc...(Lewis, Justin)
February 24, 2021 Filing 58 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #56 Letter filed by L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby rescheduled to Wednesday, April 28, 2021 at 12:45 p.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's court conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access code: 4858267. ( Initial Conference set for 4/28/2021 at 12:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/24/2021) (mro)
February 24, 2021 Filing 57 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc...(Lewis, Justin)
February 24, 2021 Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Justin D. Lewis dated Feb. 24 re: Request to Adjourn Mar. 3 Case Mgmt. Conf.. Document filed by L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc...(Lewis, Justin)
February 10, 2021 Filing 55 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #54 Letter filed by L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc. ENDORSEMENT: No pre-motion conference is necessary. The Court adopts the parties' jointly proposed schedule., (Motions due by 2/25/2021., Responses due by 3/18/2021, Replies due by 3/29/2021.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/10/2021) (nb)
February 10, 2021 Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Justin D. Lewis dated Feb. 10 re: Forthcoming Rule 12 Motion & Jointly-Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc...(Lewis, Justin)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #52 Motion for Justin D. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/10/2021) (mro)
February 10, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #52 MOTION for Justin D. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23882961. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 9, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION for Justin D. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23882961. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc...(Lewis, Justin)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. Defendant's February 3, 2021 application to designate this case as a related case, Dkt. No. 50, is denied. As counsel for Defendant notes in Defendant's letter, the prior case before Judge Koeltl was dismissed and the dismissal was upheld on appeal. Under Rule 13(a)(2) of the Rules for the Division of Business Among District Judges, with limited exceptions, "civil cases presumptively shall not be deemed related unless both cases are pending before the Court (or the earlier case is on appeal)." Now, as at the time this case was transferred to the Southern District of New York, the earlier case is not pending before the Court, and the appeal has been resolved. As a result, the Court has determined not to treat the two cases as related. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
February 3, 2021 Filing 50 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Peter G. Siachos dated Feb. 3, 2021 re: Request to Designate Case As Related (L.R. 13(b)(3)). Document filed by L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc...(Siachos, Peter)
January 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katharine H. Parker. Counsel is directed to call the court's telephone conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 4858267. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/23/2021) (mro) Modified on 1/28/2021 (yv).
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/22/2021) (jwh)
January 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so redesignated. (laq)
January 19, 2021 Filing 47 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Peter G. Siachos re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-5639-JGK. Document filed by L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Transfer Order).(Siachos, Peter)
January 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
January 19, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
January 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
January 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
January 19, 2021 Filing 46 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 4:20-cv-00944. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING #28 MOTION to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/15/21. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING ON #28 MOTION TO TRANSFER/DISMISS AND #31 MOTION TO DISMISS (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 43 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byL'oreal USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) #28 , #31 ) (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 5/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY (re #31 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byL'oreal USA, Inc.. (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 5/6/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #39 Stipulation RE OVERSIZED BRIEF & MAY 1 REPLY DEADLINE. Replies due by 5/6/2020. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for defendant L'Oreal USA, Inc. (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 4/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER RE OVERSIZED BRIEF & MAY 1 REPLY DEADLINE filed by L'oreal USA, Inc., Roxane Tierneyk, Renee Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin D. Lewis, #2 Declaration of Matthew B. George)(Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 4/24/2020) Modified on 4/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 38 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #31 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byRoxane Tierney, Renee Young. (George, Matthew) (Filed on 4/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) Modified on 4/21/2020 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 36 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Plaintiff Roxane Tierney (George, Matthew) (Filed on 4/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Plaintiff Renee Young (George, Matthew) (Filed on 4/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 34 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
April 12, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY (re #28 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss Pursuant to First-To-File Rule ) filed byL'oreal USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Reply Declaration of Justin D. Lewis)(Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 4/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 32 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss Pursuant to First-To-File Rule ) filed byRoxane Tierney, Renee Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff Renee Young, #2 Declaration of Plaintiff Roxane Tierney, #3 Declaration of Matthew B. George, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3)(George, Matthew) (Filed on 4/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by L'oreal USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 4/22/2020. Replies due by 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 3/30/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #28 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss Pursuant to First-To-File Rule and 28 USC 1404(a) by L'oreal USA, Inc. (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 3/26/2020) Modified on 3/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 29 Declaration of Justin D. Lewis in Support of #28 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss Pursuant to First-To-File Rule and 28 USC 1404(a) filed by L'oreal USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First-Filed Action, #2 Exhibit B - Order, #3 Exhibit C - Congestion Statistics)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 3/26/2020) Modified on 3/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss Pursuant to First-To-File Rule and 28 USC 1404(a) filed by L'oreal USA, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 4/9/2020. Replies due by 4/16/2020. (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 3/26/2020) Modified on 3/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action (Civ. LR 13-3) by L'oreal USA, Inc. (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 3/26/2020) Modified on 3/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 26 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against L'oreal USA, Inc. Filed by Renee Young, Roxane Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 3/12/2020) Modified on 3/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Paul D. Snyder. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice RE Karen Snyder. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #21 Stipulation CHANGING TIME. Motions due by 3/30/2020. Replies due by 5/1/2020. Responses due by 4/22/2020. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roxane Tierney, Renee Young re #14 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (George, Matthew) (Filed on 2/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER CHANGING TIME filed by L'oreal USA, Inc., Roxane Tierney, Renee Young. (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 2/27/2020) Modified on 2/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Karen E. Snyder (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14224440) filed by Roxane Tierney, Renee Young. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Snyder, Karen) (Filed on 2/27/2020) Modified on 2/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Paul D. Snyder (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14224395) filed by Roxane Tierney, Renee Young. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Snyder, Paul) (Filed on 2/27/2020) Modified on 2/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Amy Jackson. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Matthew Dameron. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Amy R. Jackson (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14219381) filed by Roxane Tierney, Renee Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jackson, Amy) (Filed on 2/26/2020) Modified on 2/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Matthew Dameron (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14219344) filed by Roxane Tierney, Renee Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dameron, Matthew) (Filed on 2/26/2020) Modified on 2/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/26/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/25/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by L'oreal USA, Inc. CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 2/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by L'oreal USA, Inc. (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 2/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by L'oreal USA, Inc... (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 2/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Daniel Lewis (Lewis, Justin) (Filed on 2/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Roxane Tierney, Renee Young.. (George, Matthew) (Filed on 2/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Young, Roxane Tierney. L'oreal USA, Inc. served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (George, Matthew) (Filed on 2/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to L'oreal USA, Inc.. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/21/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 2/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L'oreal USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14154692.). Filed by Renee Young, Roxane Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 2/7/2020) Modified on 2/10/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. L'oreal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Young
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Paul D. Snyder
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Karen E. Snyder
Represented By: Matthew Dameron
Represented By: Amy Renee Jackson
Represented By: Matthew Brian George
Represented By: Laurence David King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxane Tierney
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Paul D. Snyder
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Karen E. Snyder
Represented By: Matthew Dameron
Represented By: Amy Renee Jackson
Represented By: Matthew Brian George
Represented By: Laurence David King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Justin Daniel Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?