Mikityuk et al v. Cision US Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mitch Tallungan, Michael Esquibel and Anatoliy Mikityuk
Defendant: Cision US Inc. and Cision Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00510
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #25 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Genaira L. Tyce dated March 16, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Linda M. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (epb)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cision Ltd...(Tyce, Genaira)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Genaira L. Tyce dated March 16, 2021. Document filed by Cision Ltd., Cision US Inc...(Tyce, Genaira)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Genaira L Tyce on behalf of Cision Ltd...(Tyce, Genaira)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Linda M. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24259667. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cision Ltd., Cision US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Linda M. Jackson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Jackson, Linda)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Linda M. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24259667. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Cision Ltd., Cision US Inc...(Tyce, Genaira)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Cision Ltd. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. Service was made by E-Mail to defendant's counsel. Document filed by Anatoliy Mikityuk; Michael Esquibel; Mitch Tallungan..(Stewart, Melissa)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Cision Ltd., Cision US Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Anatoliy Mikityuk, Michael Esquibel, Mitch Tallungan. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G).(Stewart, Melissa)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Melissa L. Stewart dated March 9, 2021 re: First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Michael Esquibel, Anatoliy Mikityuk, Mitch Tallungan..(Stewart, Melissa)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Cision Ltd. waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. Document filed by Anatoliy Mikityuk; Michael Esquibel; Mitch Tallungan..(Stewart, Melissa)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Genaira L. Tyce dated March 2, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Genaira L. Tyce dated March 2, 2021. Document filed by Cision US Inc...(Tyce, Genaira)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Hannah Cole-Chu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23957745. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Esquibel, Anatoliy Mikityuk, Mitch Tallungan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Hannah Cole-Chu, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - MD, #4 Proposed Order).(Cole-Chu, Hannah) Modified on 2/16/2021 (bcu).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Melissa L. Stewart in Support re: #12 MOTION to Approve COURT-AUTHORIZED NOTICE PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(B) .. Document filed by Michael Esquibel, Anatoliy Mikityuk, Mitch Tallungan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V).(Stewart, Melissa)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Approve COURT-AUTHORIZED NOTICE PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(B) . . Document filed by Michael Esquibel, Anatoliy Mikityuk, Mitch Tallungan..(Stewart, Melissa)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Approve COURT-AUTHORIZED NOTICE PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(B) . Document filed by Michael Esquibel, Anatoliy Mikityuk, Mitch Tallungan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order).(Stewart, Melissa)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Cision US Inc. served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez at CT Corporation. Document filed by Anatoliy Mikityuk; Michael Esquibel; Mitch Tallungan..(Stewart, Melissa)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #15 MOTION for Hannah Cole-Chu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23957745. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit not notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Genaira L. Tyce dated February 11, 2021 re: Intent to File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Cision US Inc...(Tyce, Genaira)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cision US Inc...(Tyce, Genaira)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Genaira L Tyce on behalf of Cision US Inc...(Tyce, Genaira)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eliana Theodorou on behalf of Michael Esquibel, Anatoliy Mikityuk, Mitch Tallungan..(Theodorou, Eliana)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on March 22, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 3/22/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/5/2021) (va)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cision Ltd., Cision US Inc.. (sj)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Melissa Lardo Stewart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All Plaintiffs. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Melissa Lardo Stewart. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; Dollar Demand (none). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:0201; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $75,000. (sj)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Forms re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Esquibel, Anatoliy Mikityuk, Mitch Tallungan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Stewart, Melissa)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cision US Inc. and Cision LTD., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Esquibel, Anatoliy Mikityuk, Mitch Tallungan..(Stewart, Melissa)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stewart, Melissa)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cision Ltd., Cision US Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-23605972)Document filed by Anatoliy Mikityuk, Michael Esquibel, Mitch Tallungan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Stewart, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikityuk et al v. Cision US Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cision US Inc.
Represented By: Genaira L Tyce
Represented By: Linda M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cision Ltd.
Represented By: Genaira L Tyce
Represented By: Linda M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Tallungan
Represented By: Melissa Lardo Stewart
Represented By: Eliana Theodorou
Represented By: Hannah Wynne Cole-Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Esquibel
Represented By: Melissa Lardo Stewart
Represented By: Eliana Theodorou
Represented By: Hannah Wynne Cole-Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anatoliy Mikityuk
Represented By: Melissa Lardo Stewart
Represented By: Eliana Theodorou
Represented By: Hannah Wynne Cole-Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?