Sow et al v. City Of New York et al
Plaintiff: Dara Pluchino, Adama Sow, Savitri Durkee, Maria Salazar, Barbara Ross, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Oscar Rios, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, David Jaklevic and Matthew Bredder
Defendant: City Of New York, Terence Monahan, Mayor Bill de Blasio, NYPD Detective Edward Carrasco, NYPD Officers John and Jane Does, Dermot Shea, NYPD Officer Kevin Argo and NYPD Officer Talha Ahmad
Interested Party: Sergeants Benevolent Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv00533
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (48 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM) MOTION to Intervene on behalf of the Detectives Endowment Association., (45 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM) MOTION to Intervene as a party-defendant., (43 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM) MOTION to Intervene ., (38 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM) MOTION to Intervene on behalf of the Detectives Endowment Association. . Document filed by City of New York, Bill De Blasio, Terence Monahan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(Weiss, Dara)
March 19, 2021 Filing 59 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: (11 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM) Letter, . Document filed by City of New York.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(Jacobs, Elissa)
March 19, 2021 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (51 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 48 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM) MOTION to Intervene on behalf of the Detectives Endowment Association., (45 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM, 48 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 45 in 1:20-cv-10541-CM) MOTION to Intervene as a party-defendant., (43 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM) MOTION to Intervene ., (38 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM) MOTION to Intervene on behalf of the Detectives Endowment Association., (45 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM) MOTION to Intervene . . Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, Jaime Fried, Camila Gini, Alex Gutierrez, Vidal Guzman, David Jaklevic, Vivian Matthew King-Yarde, Andie Mali, Micaela Martinez, Colleen McCormack-Maitland, Charlie Monlouis-Anderle, Nicholas Mulder, Jarrett Payne, People of The State of New York, Julian Phillips, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Amali Sierra, Samira Sierra, Adama Sow, Charles Henry Wood, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Feb. 26, 2021 Letter from B. Goykadosh to All Plaintiff Counsel)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(England, Travis)
March 18, 2021 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Douglas E. Lieb dated 3/18/2021 re: Requesting the Court's Assistance in Resolving Docketing Issues Preventing Consolidated Filings. Document filed by Charles Henry Wood.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(Lieb, Douglas)
March 17, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/22/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 17, 2021 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2021 before Judge Colleen McMahon. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 15, 2021 Filing 54 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Edward Carrasco served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. Service was accepted by MS "JANE" COVO MANAGING AGENT. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sabrina Zurkuhlen; David Jaklevic; Adama Sow; Matthew Bredder; Alexandra de Mucha Pino; Dara Pluchino; Maria Salazar; Oscar Rios; Savitri Durkee; Barbara Ross..(Rankin, David)
March 10, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Sherlock Smith on behalf of Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(Smith, Robert)
March 8, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/22/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 8, 2021 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2021 before Judge Colleen McMahon. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 8, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jaclyn Hillary Grodin on behalf of People of The State of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 1:20-cv-10291-CM, 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 1:21-cv-00322-CM, 1:21-cv-00533-CM.(Grodin, Jaclyn)
March 6, 2021 Filing 49 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Talha Ahmad, Kevin Argo, Edward Carrasco, City Of New York, John and Jane Does, Terence Monahan, Dermot Shea, Bill de Blasio with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sabrina Zurkuhlen, David Jaklevic, Adama Sow, Matthew Bredder, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Dara Pluchino, Maria Salazar, Oscar Rios, Savitri Durkee, Barbara Ross. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Green, Remy)
March 5, 2021 Filing 48 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #47 Letter, filed by Savitri Durkee, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, David Jaklevic, Matthew Bredder, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Maria Salazar, Oscar Rios, Dara Pluchino, Barbara Ross, Adama Sow. ENDORSEMENT: Sure. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/7/2021.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/5/2021) (mml)
March 4, 2021 Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Wylie Stecklow dated 2021-03-04 re: Consent request for 36 hour weekend extension to file Amended Complaint. Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Stecklow, Wylie)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: The above-referenced actions have been referred to the undersigned for pre-trial supervision as set forth in Paragraph 8 of Docket # 40 in 20 Civ. 8924. All applications to the undersigned must comply with this Court's Individual Practices, which are available at:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-gabriel-w-gorenstein. The parties must comply with the deadlines set by Chief Judge McMahon in Docket#40. In addition, the Court orders the following interim deadlines as requested by the parties in their letter dated March 1, 2021 (Docket # 42 in 20 Civ. 8924): March 18, 2021: Initial Disclosures due March 25, 2021: First Request for Documents and First Set of Interrogatories dueApril 8, 2021: Defendants to provide proposed date for completion of document production April 26, 2021: Objections and Responses due; production of documents to begin. Additionally, by June 1, 2021, the parties must confer to reserve in the summer and fall a sufficient number of deposition dates for which all counsel must be available even if specific deponents are not attached to any particular date. Depositions shall be scheduled as soon as practicable. The parties shall not require a deponent to appear for a deposition after Friday, December 3, 2021, unless all parties agree otherwise or the Court orders otherwise. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/02/2021) (ama)
March 2, 2021 Filing 45 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein dated 3/2/2021 re: Interim Discovery Deadlines. Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Cohen, Elena)
February 26, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Regina Powers on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Powers, Regina)
February 26, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Masai Lord on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Lord, Masai)
February 23, 2021 Filing 42 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Dermot Shea served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. Service was accepted by "JANE" MIREA DETECTIVE. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sabrina Zurkuhlen; David Jaklevic; Adama Sow; Matthew Bredder; Alexandra de Mucha Pino; Dara Pluchino; Maria Salazar; Oscar Rios; Savitri Durkee; Barbara Ross..(Rankin, David)
February 23, 2021 Filing 41 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Terence Monahan served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. Service was accepted by "JANE" MIREA DETECTIVE. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sabrina Zurkuhlen; David Jaklevic; Adama Sow; Matthew Bredder; Alexandra de Mucha Pino; Dara Pluchino; Maria Salazar; Oscar Rios; Savitri Durkee; Barbara Ross..(Rankin, David)
February 23, 2021 Filing 40 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Talha Ahmad served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. Service was accepted by SARGENT LAU. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sabrina Zurkuhlen; David Jaklevic; Adama Sow; Matthew Bredder; Alexandra de Mucha Pino; Dara Pluchino; Maria Salazar; Oscar Rios; Savitri Durkee; Barbara Ross..(Rankin, David)
February 22, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-08924-CM. (mml)
February 22, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/22/2021. Decision: Initial conference held. Refer to docket for scheduling order. Submitted by: Chloe Lewis. (mde)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/5/2021. Any motion for leave to intervene, by any party, must be filed by 3/3/2021. Responses due 3/19/2021. Replies due 3/26/2021. Motions to dismiss the complaints must be filed by close of business on 3/26/2021. Responsive papers are due 4/16/2021. Replies are due 4/30/2021. The case is referred to The Hon. Gabriel W. Gorenstein for all pre-trial supervision other than the motions to dismiss and for leave to intervene. "All discovery" means ALL discovery, including expert discovery, individual discovery and Monell discovery. Potential class plaintiffs should be deposed by July 1, 2021, so that class certification motions can be made no later than September 10, 2021. Deposition due by 7/1/2021. Motions due by 11/15/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/22/2021) (va)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: The Court will hold a conference in this matter on Monday, February 22, 2021, at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 24A. This is an open proceeding, but we have limited space in the courtroom due to the Covid-19 pandemic and social distancing requirements. Members of the public and press may dial in at: 888-363-4749; the Access Code is: 9054506. This line will remain on mute for the duration of the conference. (Signed by Chief Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/19/2021) (jca)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned matter has been scheduled for a: Rule (16) conference on Monday, February 22, 2021 at 2:00 P.M. before the Honorable Colleen McMahon, United States District Judge in Courtroom 24A, U.S. District Court, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Any scheduling difficulties must be brought to the attention of the Court in writing and faxed to Chambers at (212) 805-6326. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Chief Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/18/2021) (jca)
February 17, 2021 Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Plaintiffs' Counsel dated February 17, 2021 re: Plaintiffs' positions on coordinated discovery, consolidation, and anticipated motions. Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Moore, Jonathan)
February 17, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Adams on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Adams, Katherine)
February 16, 2021 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Anthony P. Coles dated February 16, 2021 re: advising that the Sergeants Benevolent Association anticipates moving to intervene under Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a) and (b). Document filed by Sergeants Benevolent Association..(Coles, Anthony)
February 15, 2021 Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Brachah Goykadosh, Elissa Jacobs and Dara L. Weiss dated February 15, 2021 re: Defendants' positions on coordinated discovery, consolidation and anticipated motions. Document filed by City Of New York..(Weiss, Dara)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/4/2021) (mml)
February 4, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dara Lynn Weiss on behalf of City Of New York, Bill de Blasio..(Weiss, Dara)
February 1, 2021 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bill de Blasio served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by Sabrina Zurkuhlen; David Jaklevic; Adama Sow; Matthew Bredder; Alexandra de Mucha Pino; Dara Pluchino; Maria Salazar; Oscar Rios; Savitri Durkee; Barbara Ross..(Rankin, David)
February 1, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City Of New York served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by Sabrina Zurkuhlen; David Jaklevic; Adama Sow; Matthew Bredder; Alexandra de Mucha Pino; Dara Pluchino; Maria Salazar; Oscar Rios; Savitri Durkee; Barbara Ross..(Rankin, David)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Please docket this notice from Chief Judge McMahon in cases: Payne v. DiBlasio, 20 Civ. 8924; Wood v. City of New York, 20 Civ. 10541; People v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 322; Sow v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 533. Counsel: I now have four matters on my docket relating to the conduct of the NYPD in connection with various demonstrations that occurred in New York City during 2020, that are connected to the Black Lives Matter (BLM) movement and the deaths of George Floyd and other individuals at the hands of law enforcement officials in other jurisdictions. They are Payne v. DiBlasio, 20 Civ. 8924, Wood v. City of New York, 20 Civ. 10541, People v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 322, Sow v. City of New York, 21 Civ. 533. I preliminarily consolidated these cases for pre-trial purposes. The defendants have moved to deconsolidate Payne and Wood, and the plaintiffs in Payne object to consolidation of their action with the Attorney General's suit, though they do not object to coordinated discovery and joint motion practice on the common issues of law and fact regarding policies and practices of the NYPD that undergird all four of these lawsuits. I note that Wood, People and Sow were all filed as "related cases" to Payne - and so they are, whether they end up being tried together or not - so I anticipate that most pre-trial matters, and certainly discovery, will be consolidated. I want to conference all four cases initially, so I can get my head around how to manage these cases and start them moving. I want that conference to take place in person - "in person" meaning that no more than two attorneys for each plaintiff and no more than four attorneys for the defendants may be present in my courtroom, masked and socially distanced, at an on-the-record conference. We cannot possibly accommodate all the members of the public who would want to be present at this conference, even with an overflow courtroom; we will provide a call in number for maximum public access. At present, as you know, we are not holding in person proceedings in the federal courthouses, so the February 5 date that is currently on your calendars will not work. I would like to schedule this proceeding for the week of February 16-17-18-19. As to the exact date, I would prefer to suit the convenience of counsel, so please confer and be in touch with my deputy clerk, Mariela de Jesus, Mariela_DeJesus@nysd.uscourts.gov with suggested dates and times during that week. You should be prepared to discuss anticipated motions, coordinated discovery and the reasons why these cases should or should not be consolidated. If each plaintiff and the defendants would file a letter of no more than three pages summarizing your positions at last five days prior to the conference; you can flesh them out fully at the conference. There really is no need to make a lot of formal procedural motions; I would rather hear you outline your positions and rule from the bench. Magistrate Judge Gorenstein is the assigned MJ on these cases. I will be inviting him to participate at this conference as well. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/25/2021) (mml) Modified on 2/5/2021 (mml).
January 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
January 25, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
January 25, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-00322-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
January 22, 2021 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kevin Argo. (sj)
January 22, 2021 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Talha Ahmad. (sj)
January 22, 2021 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward Carrasco. (sj)
January 22, 2021 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Terence Monahan. (sj)
January 22, 2021 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dermot Shea. (sj)
January 22, 2021 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bill de Blasio. (sj)
January 22, 2021 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (sj)
January 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Bruce Rankin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (sj)
January 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Bruce Rankin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All Plaintiffs. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
January 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
January 22, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 1:21cv0322. (sj)
January 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 21, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Leigh Pattiz on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Pattiz, Rebecca)
January 21, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deema Azizi on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Azizi, Deema)
January 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Arena on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Arena, Marc)
January 21, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Luna Droubi on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Droubi, Luna)
January 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan C Moore on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Moore, Jonathan)
January 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Massimi on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Massimi, Jessica)
January 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Remy Green on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Green, Remy)
January 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gideon Orion Oliver on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Oliver, Gideon)
January 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elena Louisa Cohen on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Cohen, Elena)
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYPD Officer Kevin Argo (Shield No. 8054), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Rankin, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYPD Officer Talha Ahmad (Shield No. 21358), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Rankin, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYPD Detective Edward Carrasco (Shield No. 1567), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Rankin, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Police Department Chief of Department Terence Monahan, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Rankin, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Police Department Commissioner Dermot Shea, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Rankin, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayor Bill de Blasio, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Rankin, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Rankin, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wylie M. Stecklow on behalf of Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Stecklow, Wylie)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-CV-322 (CM). Document filed by Matthew Bredder, Savitri Durkee, David Jaklevic, Dara Pluchino, Oscar Rios, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Adama Sow, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino..(Rankin, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rider to Civil Cover Sheet).(Rankin, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Talha Ahmad, Kevin Argo, Edward Carrasco, City Of New York, John and Jane Does, Terence Monahan, Dermot Shea, Bill de Blasio. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23620204)Document filed by Sabrina Zurkuhlen, David Jaklevic, Adama Sow, Matthew Bredder, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Dara Pluchino, Maria Salazar, Oscar Rios, Savitri Durkee, Barbara Ross..(Rankin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sow et al v. City Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dara Pluchino
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Jonathan C Moore
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Represented By: Luna Droubi
Represented By: Marc Arena
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow
Represented By: Deema Azizi
Represented By: Regina Powers
Represented By: Masai Lord
Represented By: Katherine Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adama Sow
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Jonathan C Moore
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Represented By: Luna Droubi
Represented By: Marc Arena
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow
Represented By: Deema Azizi
Represented By: Regina Powers
Represented By: Masai Lord
Represented By: Katherine Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savitri Durkee
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Jonathan C Moore
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Represented By: Luna Droubi
Represented By: Marc Arena
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow
Represented By: Deema Azizi
Represented By: Regina Powers
Represented By: Masai Lord
Represented By: Katherine Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Salazar
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Jonathan C Moore
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Represented By: Luna Droubi
Represented By: Marc Arena
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow
Represented By: Deema Azizi
Represented By: Regina Powers
Represented By: Masai Lord
Represented By: Katherine Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ross
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Jonathan C Moore
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Represented By: Luna Droubi
Represented By: Marc Arena
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow
Represented By: Deema Azizi
Represented By: Regina Powers
Represented By: Masai Lord
Represented By: Katherine Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra de Mucha Pino
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Jonathan C Moore
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Represented By: Luna Droubi
Represented By: Marc Arena
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow
Represented By: Deema Azizi
Represented By: Regina Powers
Represented By: Masai Lord
Represented By: Katherine Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Rios
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Jonathan C Moore
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Represented By: Luna Droubi
Represented By: Marc Arena
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow
Represented By: Deema Azizi
Represented By: Regina Powers
Represented By: Masai Lord
Represented By: Katherine Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Zurkuhlen
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Jonathan C Moore
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Represented By: Luna Droubi
Represented By: Marc Arena
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow
Represented By: Deema Azizi
Represented By: Regina Powers
Represented By: Masai Lord
Represented By: Katherine Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jaklevic
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Jonathan C Moore
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Represented By: Luna Droubi
Represented By: Marc Arena
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow
Represented By: Deema Azizi
Represented By: Regina Powers
Represented By: Masai Lord
Represented By: Katherine Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bredder
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Jonathan C Moore
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Represented By: Luna Droubi
Represented By: Marc Arena
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: David Bruce Rankin
Represented By: Wylie M. Stecklow
Represented By: Deema Azizi
Represented By: Regina Powers
Represented By: Masai Lord
Represented By: Katherine Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Dara Lynn Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill de Blasio
Represented By: Dara Lynn Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Detective Edward Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officers John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Kevin Argo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Talha Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sergeants Benevolent Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?