State of New York et al v. United States Department of Labor et al
Plaintiff: District of Columbia, State of Colorado, State of North Carolina, State of Minnesota, State of Illinois, State of New Mexico, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Vermont, State of Connecticut, State of Nevada, Dana Nessel on behalf of the People of Michigan, State of New Jersey and State of California
Defendant: United States Department of Labor and Al Stewart
Lead Plaintiff: State of New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv00536
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sidney H Stein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Ryan B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Satoshi Yana to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
February 17, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Ryan B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23974428. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Smith, Ryan)
February 17, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Ryan B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23974428. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 16, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Satoshi Yanai to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23961979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Yanai, Satoshi)
February 16, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Satoshi Yanai to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23961979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Rachel Bell-Munger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
February 12, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Rachel Bell-Munger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23905586. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 11, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Rachel Bell-Munger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23905586. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Bell-Munger, Rachel)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion to Stay. In light of the government's statement that it "intends to propose rescission of the rule at issue in this case in the near future," defendants' time to answer or move in response to the complaint is extended to June 18, 2021. Defendants are directed to submit a status report on or before March 26, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/9/2021) (kv)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Trini Gao to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
February 9, 2021 Filing 24 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Stay Case addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Jennifer Jude dated 2/9/21. Document filed by Al Stewart, United States Department of Labor..(Jude, Jennifer)
February 9, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Trini Gao to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23872652. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing).(Gao, Trini)
February 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Trini Gao to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23872652. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 9, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Al Stewart answer due 6/18/2021; United States Department of Labor answer due 6/18/2021. (kv)
February 3, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heidi Parry Stern on behalf of State of Nevada..(Stern, Heidi)
February 1, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy A. Walker on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania..(Walker, Nancy)
February 1, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Konopka on behalf of District of Columbia..(Konopka, Kathleen)
January 29, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Daniel Battles on behalf of State of Vermont..(Battles, Benjamin)
January 29, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Al Stewart served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021; United States Department of Labor served on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. Document filed by State of New York..(Kaye, Fiona)
January 29, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Zachary Alexander Risk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23711289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Tania Maestas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on CONSENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONSES BY EMAIL. ENDORSEMENT: Consent motion [Doc. No. 12] granted. So ordered. Granting #12 Motion to Serve. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/27/2021) (rjm)
January 27, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Tania Maestas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23719444. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Maestas, Tania)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Zachary Alexander Risk to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (lab)
January 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Hunt Muse on behalf of State of Illinois..(Muse, Kathryn)
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT MOTION to Serve Complaint and Summonses By Email. Document filed by State of New York..(Kaye, Fiona)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Dana Nessel on behalf of the People of Michigan. Related Document Number: #10 ..(Risk, Zachary) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Zachary Alexander Risk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23711289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dana Nessel on behalf of the People of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Risk, Zachary)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ann Jude on behalf of Al Stewart, United States Department of Labor..(Jude, Jennifer)
January 27, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Tania Maestas to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23719444. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniela Nogueira on behalf of State of New York..(Nogueira, Daniela)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Labor. (sj)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Al Stewart. (sj)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Marie Meyer on behalf of State of New York..(Meyer, Amanda)
January 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AL STEWART, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Labor, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Dana Nessel on behalf of the People of Michigan, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Vermont..(Kaye, Fiona)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Labor, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Dana Nessel on behalf of the People of Michigan, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Vermont..(Kaye, Fiona)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kaye, Fiona)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Al Stewart, United States Department of Labor. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23620692)Document filed by State of New Jersey, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Illinois, State of Colorado, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Vermont, Dana Nessel on behalf of the People of Michigan, State of Connecticut, State of Nevada, District of Columbia..(Kaye, Fiona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York et al v. United States Department of Labor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Kathleen Konopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Rachel E. Bell-Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Kathryn Hunt Muse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Tania Maestas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Ryan B Smith
Represented By: Nancy A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Trini Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Battles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Nessel on behalf of the People of Michigan
Represented By: Zachary A Risk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Satoshi Yanai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Fiona Jeannette Kaye
Represented By: Amanda Marie Meyer
Represented By: Daniela Nogueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Jude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Stewart
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Jude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?