Weinberger v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bonnie Weinberger
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.
Interested Party: Shannon Fremgen, Mary Christopherson-Juve, Sandra Wilde, Denise DeLeon and Michael Wilder
Case Number: 1:2021cv00615
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 at
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: While Hagens Berman's request for appointment is currently unopposed, the Court wishes to provide an opportunity for interested persons to state their objection, if any, to such appointment. Accordingly, is HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to the appointment of Hagens Berman as interim lead counsel in the above-captioned actions shall be due no later than seven days after the entry of this order; any reply to such opposition shall be due no later than four days after the filing and service of the opposition. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/8/2021) (mro)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/8/2021) (jca)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. The Court declines to endorse the parties' proposed order. Case No. 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF, Dkt No. 39. The proposed order was not accompanied by a letter as required by Rule 1(F) of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. The Court will await any objections to the proposed consolidation of the cases referenced in that order, in accordance with its February 24th order, Dkt. No. 41. Moreover, the Court does not anticipate that it will establish a briefing schedule before holding a pre-motion conference. The Court construes the parties' proposed order as a request to extend the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaints in Fremgen v. Amazon.com, et al. and each of its related cases. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to those complaints is adjourned sine die pending the resolution of the application to consolidate the cases pending before the Court and the application to appoint lead counsel for those cases. The Court anticipates that a consolidated complaint will be filed within 45 days after an order or orders consolidating the Fremgen, Sacks, Weinberger, Bonilla, Silverman, Cook and Lerner Actions and appointing interim co-lead counsel for the putative plaintiff class. The parties are again directed to review and comply with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv) Modified on 3/2/2021 (wv).
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Before the court is a motion by plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions and Amazon, a defendant in each of those actions. The parties request that the above-captioned cases be consolidated. Any opposition to the consolidation of these actions shall be due no later than ten days after the entry of this order; any reply to such opposition shall be due no later than seven days after the filing and service of the opposition. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/24/2021) (mro)
February 24, 2021 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent News Corporation for HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.. Document filed by HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(Lent, Charles)
February 24, 2021 Filing 20 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(Lent, Charles)
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Scott Lent on behalf of HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(Lent, Charles)
February 23, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Steve W. Berman in Support re: #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Unopposed Motion to Appoint Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Proposed Class.. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Berman, Steve)
February 23, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Unopposed Motion to Appoint Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Proposed Class. . Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Berman, Steve)
February 23, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Unopposed Motion to Appoint Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Proposed Class. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Berman, Steve)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Amazon.com, Inc...(Pitt, Jonathan)
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for William G. Caldes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23957084. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bonnie Weinberger. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A - Affidavit of William G. Caldes, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Caldes, William)
February 16, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for William G. Caldes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23957084. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Bradley Pitt on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc...(Pitt, Jonathan)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steve W. Berman, et al. dated February 12, 2021 re: Letter in support of Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation and Setting Deadlines. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Shannon Fremgen, Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Diana J. Zinser to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23889466. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bonnie Weinberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Diana J. Zinser, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Zinser, Diana)
February 10, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Diana J. Zinser to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23889466. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 10, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
February 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
February 10, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Jeffrey L. Spector to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23879476. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bonnie Weinberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jeffrey L. Spector, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Spector, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Eugene A. Spector to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23879340. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bonnie Weinberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Eugene A. Spector, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Spector, Eugene)
February 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Eugene A. Spector to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23879340. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Jeffrey L. Spector to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23879476. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey J. Corrigan on behalf of Bonnie Weinberger..(Corrigan, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Philip Murray on behalf of Bonnie Weinberger..(Murray, Brian)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.com, Inc...(dnh)
January 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bonnie Weinberger. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
January 25, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
January 25, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
January 25, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF. (dnh)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-00351 (GHW). Document filed by Bonnie Weinberger..(Linkh, Gregory)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bonnie Weinberger..(Linkh, Gregory)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linkh, Gregory)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23651602)Document filed by Bonnie Weinberger..(Linkh, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinberger v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Bradley Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.
Represented By: Charles Scott Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Weinberger
Represented By: Gregory Bradley Linkh
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Corrigan
Represented By: Eugene A. Spector
Represented By: Diana Zinser
Represented By: William G. Caldes
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Spector
Represented By: Brian Philip Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shannon Fremgen
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mary Christopherson-Juve
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sandra Wilde
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Denise DeLeon
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael Wilder
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?