Garcia v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Garcia
Defendant: Guerra, Thomas, Joseph and Blatz
Case Number: 1:2021cv00636
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Daniel Garcia.(sc)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Daniel Garcia.(sc)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE MEMORANDUM, dated 2/16/21 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Daniel Garcia. New Address: Manhattan Psychiatric Center-Kirby Forensic Psych. Center, Wards Island, New York, 10025. (sc)
January 26, 2021 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization to Daniel Garcia, NYSID: 00110773Z, B&C No. 3002000357 at Bellevue Hospital Prison Ward, 462 1st Avenue, Psych Ward, 19th Floor, New York, NY 10016. (kh)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 2/24/2021. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 2/24/2021. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 2/24/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/25/2021) (Attachments: #1 Supplement IFP application, #2 Supplement Prisoner authorization) (scn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 25, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
January 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blatz, Guerra, Joseph, Thomas. Document filed by Daniel Garcia. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?