Nelson v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: BRENDON NELSON
Defendant: ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC and ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00777
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seamus Barrett on behalf of NICHOLAS BOGAN, STEFFON DUNLOP, ALAA KHOURY, Brandon Nelson, BENEDICT WONG..(Barrett, Seamus)
February 24, 2021 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Document filed by STEFFON DUNLOP, NICHOLAS BOGAN, BENEDICT WONG, Brandon Nelson, ALAA KHOURY..(Cabeceiras, Alexander)
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Document filed by BENEDICT WONG, STEFFON DUNLOP, ALAA KHOURY, NICHOLAS BOGAN..(Cabeceiras, Alexander) Modified on 2/25/2021 (dnh).
February 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Hope Miller on behalf of Brandon Nelson..(Miller, Caroline)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before February 24, 2021, Plaintiff shall amend his Complaint to allege the citizenship of each constituent person or entity comprising the Defendant LLC's (If Plaintiff determines that all Defendants are, in fact, corporations, notwithstanding their names, it shall file a letter to that effect by no later than the same date). SO ORDERED., ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2021.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/10/2021) (ama)
February 9, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Robinhood Financial LLC answer due 4/5/2021; Robinhood Markets, Inc. answer due 4/5/2021; Robinhood Securities, LLC answer due 4/5/2021., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (ama)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: denying without prejudice to renewal 8 Motion to Intervene. On February 5, 2021, non-party April Miller, proceeding without counsel, moved to intervene as a plaintiff in this case. ECF No. 8. Although the motion references a "Brief in Support... attached," the only supporting documentation provided appears to be unidentified and unauthenticated screenshots from a cellphone. Because Ms. Miller provides no legal authority or cognizable evidence in support of her motion, it is DENIED without prejudice to renewal with appropriate supporting authority and documentation. Separately, on February 4, 2021, Defendants waived service of process, making their deadline to answer or respond to the Complaint is April 5, 2021. ECF No. 7. In light of that, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for March 18, 2021 is ADJOURNED to April 15, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 8 and to mail a copy of this Order to Ms. Miller. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/09/2021) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AS A PLAINTIFF.Document filed by April Miller, a non-party.(sc)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robinhood Financial LLC waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Robinhood Securities, LLC waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Document filed by Brendon Nelson..(Cabeceiras, Alexander)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robinhood Financial LLC waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Robinhood Securities, LLC waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Document filed by Brendon Nelson..(Cabeceiras, Alexander)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC..(dnh)
January 31, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Brendon Nelson..(Cabeceiras, Alexander)
January 31, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cabeceiras, Alexander)
January 31, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Document filed by Brendon Nelson..(Cabeceiras, Alexander)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/29/2021) (ks)
January 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BRENDON NELSON; ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC; ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC; ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
January 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Contempt Proceedings;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331;. (jgo)
January 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23727947)Document filed by BRENDON NELSON..(Cabeceiras, Alexander) Modified on 1/29/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDON NELSON
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?