Ramirez et al v. 1701 Pizza Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Esteban Cuautle, Eugenio Ramirez, Teofilo Almonte and Eugenio Ramirez, and Esteban Cuautle, and Teofilo Almonte,
Defendant: Salvatore Romano, 1701 Pizza Ltd., Luigi Romano and 1701 Pizza Ltd. doing business as Luigi's Pizza
Case Number: 1:2021cv00792
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Salvatore Romano served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. Service was accepted by Mr. Romano, a person of suitable age and discretion. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Esteban Cuautle ; Teofilo Almonte; Teofilo Almonte ; Esteban Cuautle; Eugenio Ramirez; Eugenio Ramirez..(Mietus, Danielle)
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. 1701 Pizza Ltd. served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York.. Document filed by Esteban Cuautle ; Teofilo Almonte; Teofilo Almonte ; Esteban Cuautle; Eugenio Ramirez; Eugenio Ramirez..(Mietus, Danielle)
February 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Luigi Romano served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. Service was accepted by John Doe, a person of suitable age and discretion. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Esteban Cuautle ; Teofilo Almonte; Teofilo Almonte ; Esteban Cuautle; Eugenio Ramirez; Eugenio Ramirez..(Mietus, Danielle)
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1701 Pizza Ltd., Luigi Romano, Salvatore Romano..(pc)
January 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 29, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Teofilo Almonte, Esteban Cuautle, Eugenio Ramirez, Eugenio Ramirez, Teofilo Almonte, Esteban Cuautle added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Teofilo Almonte, Esteban Cuautle, Eugenio Ramirez, Eugenio Ramirez, Teofilo Almonte, Esteban Cuautle. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Mietus, Danielle)
January 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Danielle Elizabeth Mietus re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Esteban Cuautle and Teofilo Almonte to CM ECF with the party text for each " on behalf of all others similarly-situated". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
January 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Danielle Elizabeth Mietus. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Eugenio Ramirez, and Esteban Cuautle, and Teofilo Almonte, 1701 Pizza Ltd.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael John Borrelli on behalf of Teofilo Almonte, Esteban Cuautle, Eugenio Ramirez, and Esteban Cuautle, and Teofilo Almonte,, Eugenio Ramirez..(Borrelli, Michael)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Todd Coleman on behalf of Teofilo Almonte, Esteban Cuautle, Eugenio Ramirez, and Esteban Cuautle, and Teofilo Almonte,, Eugenio Ramirez..(Coleman, Alexander)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Teofilo Almonte, Esteban Cuautle, Eugenio Ramirez, and Esteban Cuautle, and Teofilo Almonte,, Eugenio Ramirez..(Mietus, Danielle)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Teofilo Almonte, Esteban Cuautle, Eugenio Ramirez, and Esteban Cuautle, and Teofilo Almonte,, Eugenio Ramirez..(Mietus, Danielle)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Teofilo Almonte, Esteban Cuautle, Eugenio Ramirez, and Esteban Cuautle, and Teofilo Almonte,, Eugenio Ramirez..(Mietus, Danielle)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1701 PIZZA LTD. d/b/a LUIGI'S PIZZA, and SALVATORE ROMANO, individually, and LUIGI ROMANO, individually, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teofilo Almonte, Esteban Cuautle, Eugenio Ramirez, and Esteban Cuautle, and Teofilo Almonte,, Eugenio Ramirez..(Mietus, Danielle)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mietus, Danielle)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1701 Pizza Ltd., Luigi Romano, Salvatore Romano. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23734700)Document filed by Eugenio Ramirez, and Esteban Cuautle, and Teofilo Almonte,, Eugenio Ramirez, Teofilo Almonte, Esteban Cuautle..(Mietus, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. 1701 Pizza Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Cuautle
Represented By: Michael John Borrelli
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Mietus
Represented By: Alexander Todd Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenio Ramirez
Represented By: Michael John Borrelli
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Mietus
Represented By: Alexander Todd Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teofilo Almonte
Represented By: Michael John Borrelli
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Mietus
Represented By: Alexander Todd Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenio Ramirez, and Esteban Cuautle, and Teofilo Almonte,
Represented By: Michael John Borrelli
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Mietus
Represented By: Alexander Todd Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1701 Pizza Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luigi Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1701 Pizza Ltd. doing business as Luigi's Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?