Lopez v. Nelson Management Group LTD. et al
Plaintiff: David Lopez
Defendant: Nelson Management Group LTD. and LBPR Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00865
Filed: January 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. LBPR Services, LLC served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021; Nelson Management Group LTD. served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. Service was accepted by NY Secretary of State. Document filed by David Lopez..(Hassan, Abdul)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Application is GRANTED. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than April 14, 2021. Plaintiff is ORDERED to promptly file proof of se1vice of the summons and complaint on ECF. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 9. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/15/2021) (kv)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint in this Matter, nunc pro tunc, on Consent addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Stephen P. Pischl dated March 15, 2021. Document filed by LBPR Services, LLC, Nelson Management Group LTD...(Pischl, Stephen)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Paul Pischl on behalf of LBPR Services, LLC, Nelson Management Group LTD...(Pischl, Stephen)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEDIATION AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE and Judge's rules served on NELSON MANAGEMENT GROUP LTD. LBPR SERVICES, LLC on 02/09/2021. Service was made by Priority Mail. Document filed by David Lopez..(Hassan, Abdul)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. The parties are directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Aaron no later than one week after an answer is filed to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference scheduled in this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/01/2021) (ama)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEDIATION AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA"), 29 U.S.C. 201et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, by separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring this case to the assigned Magistrate Judge for settlement purposes. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, no later than one week after an answer is filed, the parties shall contact the Chambers of the assigned Magistrate Judge to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference scheduled below. Separate and apart from the foregoing, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on May 5, 2021, at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order aredirected (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this orderand the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/5/2021 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/01/2021) (ama)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LBPR Services, LLC, Nelson Management Group LTD...(gp)
February 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
February 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
February 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
January 31, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hassan, Abdul)
January 31, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nelson Management Group LTD., and LBPR Services, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David Lopez..(Hassan, Abdul)
January 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LBPR Services, LLC, Nelson Management Group LTD.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23765172)Document filed by David Lopez..(Hassan, Abdul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Nelson Management Group LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Management Group LTD.
Represented By: Stephen Paul Pischl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBPR Services, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Paul Pischl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lopez
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?