Michael Grecco Productions Inc. v. Gannett, Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Grecco Productions Inc.
Defendant: Gannett, Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00909
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. The parties are directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/2/2021) (va)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed no later than 4/30/2021. Fact Discovery due by 7/30/2021. Depositions shall be completed by 7/30/2021. Expert Discovery due by 9/8/2021. Deposition due by 9/8/2021. Discovery due by 10/8/2021. Status Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Motions due by 10/22/2021. This case is to be tired to a jury. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is three days. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/2/2021) (va)
April 2, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/2/2021 by Telephone Conference. Ronald Adelman present by telephone for Plaintiff. Nina Boyajian present by telephone for Defendant. Case management plan approved. Referral to Magistrate Judge for settlement. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for October 14, 2021 at 11:00AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
April 1, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gannett, Co., Inc...(Boyajian, Nina)
April 1, 2021 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gannett, Co., Inc...(Boyajian, Nina)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Nina Diana Boyajian to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (wt)
March 26, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions Inc...(Adelman, Ronald)
March 3, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Nina Diana Boyajian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24158597. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Nina Diana Boyajian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24158597. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gannett, Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nina D. Boyajian, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from California, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Boyajian, Nina)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Michael J. Grygiel dated 03/02/2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Michael J. Grygiel dated 03/02/2021. Document filed by Gannett, Co., Inc...(Grygiel, Michael)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on April 2, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 4/2/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/17/2021) (va)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Gannett, Co., Inc. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. Service was accepted by Katie Bush. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions Inc...(Adelman, Ronald)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gannett, Co., Inc.. (sj)
February 3, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 3, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 3, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ronald Wolf Adelman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Adelman, Ronald)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions Inc...(Adelman, Ronald)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Adelman, Ronald)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gannett Co., Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions Inc...(Adelman, Ronald)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gannett, Co., Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23792605)Document filed by Michael Grecco Productions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit).(Adelman, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Grecco Productions Inc. v. Gannett, Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grecco Productions Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Wolf Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett, Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Grygiel
Represented By: Nina D. Boyajian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?