Lundeen et al v. Krucial Staffing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Oanh Lam, Jaime Rector, Joshua Tedesco, Staci Lundeen, Katrina Rugar, Aubdrea Harris, Shannon Hansen, Carlissa Strafford, Tonya Olvera, Kayla Miller, Jaqueline Marstorp, Aundrea Harris and Catrina Rugar
Defendant: Brian M. Cleary V and Krucial Staffing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01071
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Brian M. Cleary V, Krucial Staffing, LLC..(Abrams, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #20 Motion for Michael Jay Abrams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/29/2021) (ks)
March 26, 2021 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Gregory Antollino dated March 26, 2021 re: new US Supreme Court authority. Document filed by Shannon Hansen, Aundrea Harris, Oanh Lam, Staci Lundeen, Jaqueline Marstorp, Kayla Miller, Tonya Olvera, Jaime Rector, Catrina Rugar, Carlissa Strafford, Joshua Tedesco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court Ford Motor decision).(Antollino, Gregory)
March 26, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #20 MOTION for Michael Jay Abrams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24308581. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . Document filed by Brian M. Cleary V, Krucial Staffing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11).(Abrams, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re: #20 MOTION for Michael Jay Abrams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24308581. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . Document filed by Shannon Hansen, Aundrea Harris, Oanh Lam, Staci Lundeen, Jaqueline Marstorp, Kayla Miller, Tonya Olvera, Jaime Rector, Catrina Rugar, Carlissa Strafford, Joshua Tedesco..(Antollino, Gregory)
March 25, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Michael Jay Abrams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24308581. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brian M. Cleary V, Krucial Staffing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Abrams, Michael)
March 25, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Michael Jay Abrams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24308581. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Shannon Hansen, Aundrea Harris, Oanh Lam, Staci Lundeen, Jaqueline Marstorp, Kayla Miller, Tonya Olvera, Jaime Rector, Catrina Rugar, Carlissa Strafford, Joshua Tedesco..(Antollino, Gregory)
March 19, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Gregory Antollino in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Shannon Hansen, Aundrea Harris, Oanh Lam, Staci Lundeen, Jaqueline Marstorp, Kayla Miller, Tonya Olvera, Jaime Rector, Catrina Rugar, Carlissa Strafford, Joshua Tedesco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Portions of Brian Clearys deposition in Allen v. Krucial Staffing, #2 Exhibit B Declarations of 8 plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit C Jurisdictions where Krucial is registered to do business, #4 Exhibit D Two additional juridsictions).(Antollino, Gregory)
March 8, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Brian M. Cleary V, Krucial Staffing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Elaine Lichtenauer, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jayson Kuti).(Cohen, Nancy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Brian M. Cleary V, Krucial Staffing, LLC..(Cohen, Nancy)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/9/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/4/2021) (ks)
March 4, 2021 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 20cv2859 and declined by Judge John G. Koeltl and returned to wheel for assignment. (ad)
March 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
March 4, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
February 24, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint,. Brian M. Cleary V served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. Service was accepted by Michelle Wilber. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Kayla Miller; Joshua Tedesco; Carlissa Strafford; Catrina Rugar; Jaqueline Marstorp; Oanh Lam; Jaime Rector; Staci Lundeen; Tonya Olvera; Aundrea Harris; Shannon Hansen..(Antollino, Gregory)
February 16, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Bergstein on behalf of Shannon Hansen, Aundrea Harris, Oanh Lam, Staci Lundeen, Jaqueline Marstorp, Kayla Miller, Tonya Olvera, Jaime Rector, Catrina Rugar, Carlissa Strafford, Joshua Tedesco..(Bergstein, Stephen)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint,. Krucial Staffing, LLC served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Kayla Miller; Joshua Tedesco; Carlissa Strafford; Catrina Rugar; Jaqueline Marstorp; Oanh Lam; Jaime Rector; Staci Lundeen; Tonya Olvera; Aundrea Harris; Shannon Hansen..(Antollino, Gregory)
February 9, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #6 Complaint, against Brian M. Cleary V, Krucial Staffing, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kayla Miller, Joshua Tedesco, Carlissa Strafford, Catrina Rugar, Jaqueline Marstorp, Oanh Lam, Jaime Rector, Staci Lundeen, Tonya Olvera, Aundrea Harris, Shannon Hansen. Related document: #6 Complaint,..(Antollino, Gregory)
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian M. Cleary V..(dnh)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Krucial Staffing, LLC..(dnh)
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian M. Cleary V, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Shannon Hansen, Aundrea Harris, Oanh Lam, Staci Lundeen, Jaqueline Marstorp, Kayla Miller, Tonya Olvera, Jaime Rector, Catrina Rugar, Carlissa Strafford, Joshua Tedesco..(Antollino, Gregory)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KRUCIAL STAFFING, LLC, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by Shannon Hansen, Aundrea Harris, Oanh Lam, Staci Lundeen, Jaqueline Marstorp, Kayla Miller, Tonya Olvera, Jaime Rector, Catrina Rugar, Carlissa Strafford, Joshua Tedesco..(Antollino, Gregory)
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Brian M. Cleary V, Krucial Staffing, LLC. Document filed by Kayla Miller, Joshua Tedesco, Carlissa Strafford, Catrina Rugar, Jaqueline Marstorp, Oanh Lam, Jaime Rector, Staci Lundeen, Tonya Olvera, Aundrea Harris, Shannon Hansen..(Antollino, Gregory)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-2859. Document filed by Shannon Hansen, Aundrea Harris, Oanh Lam, Staci Lundeen, Jaqueline Marstorp, Kayla Miller, Tonya Olvera, Jaime Rector, Catrina Rugar, Carlissa Strafford, Joshua Tedesco..(Antollino, Gregory)
February 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory S. Antollino. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $412,566,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $413,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
February 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Gregory S. Antollino, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
February 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gregory S. Antollino to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not properly signed by the attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
February 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory S. Antollino. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Katrina Rugar; Aubdrea Harris; Joshua Tedesco. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
February 8, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge John G. Koeltl as possibly related to 20-cv-2859. (jgo)
February 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
February 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gregory S. Antollino to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF case caption must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption (Jackie Marstorp). If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
February 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian M. Cleary V, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shannon Hansen, Aubdrea Harris, Oanh Lam, Staci Lundeen, Jaqueline Marstorp, Kayla Miller, Tonya Olvera, Jaime Rector, Katrina Rugar, Carlissa Strafford, Joshua Tedesco..(Antollino, Gregory) Modified on 2/8/2021 (jgo).
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KRUCIAL STAFFING, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shannon Hansen, Aubdrea Harris, Oanh Lam, Staci Lundeen, Jaqueline Marstorp, Kayla Miller, Tonya Olvera, Jaime Rector, Katrina Rugar, Carlissa Strafford, Joshua Tedesco..(Antollino, Gregory) Modified on 2/8/2021 (jgo).
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Antollino, Gregory)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Krucial Staffing, LLC, Brian M. Cleary V. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23844278)Document filed by Kayla Miller, Joshua Tedesco, Carlissa Strafford, Katrina Rugar, Jaqueline Marstorp, Oanh Lam, Jaime Rector, Staci Lundeen, Tonya Olvera, Aubdrea Harris, Shannon Hansen..(Antollino, Gregory) Modified on 2/8/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundeen et al v. Krucial Staffing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oanh Lam
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Rector
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Tedesco
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Lundeen
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Rugar
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubdrea Harris
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Hansen
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlissa Strafford
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Olvera
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Miller
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaqueline Marstorp
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aundrea Harris
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catrina Rugar
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian M. Cleary V
Represented By: Michael J. Abrams
Represented By: Nancy Sher Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krucial Staffing, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Abrams
Represented By: Nancy Sher Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?