Li et al v. Prodigy Network LLC et al
Plaintiff: Haiyu Wang and Maolin Li
Defendant: Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC, Prodigy Network LLC and Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01117
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Katherine Burghardt Kramer in Support re: #25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Prodigy Network LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC, and Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC.. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8).(Kramer, Katherine)
April 6, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Prodigy Network LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC, and Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC. . Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment Order).(Kramer, Katherine)
April 6, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Prodigy Network LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC, and Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang. Responses due by 4/8/2021.(Kramer, Katherine)
April 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Katherine Burghardt Kramer to RE-FILE Document #23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Prodigy Network LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC, and Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. NOTE: You must file the Motion first (attachment #1 is the Motion), then re-file the Memorandum of Law separately and link to the motion. (ldi)
April 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Katherine Burghardt Kramer to RE-FILE Document #24 Affidavit in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): document linked to filing error. (ldi)
March 18, 2021 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Katherine Burghardt Kramer in Support re: #23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Prodigy Network LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC, and Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC.. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Affidavit, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Affidavit, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Affidavit, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Affidavit).(Kramer, Katherine) Modified on 4/6/2021 (ldi).
March 18, 2021 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Default Judgment as to Prodigy Network LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC, and Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang. Responses due by 4/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Notice to Defendant of Default Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment Order).(Kramer, Katherine) Modified on 4/6/2021 (ldi).
March 18, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice to Defendant of Motion for Default Judgment, Memo of Law ISO Default Judgment; Affidavit ISO Default Judgment and accompanying exhibits served on Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC on 03/18/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
March 18, 2021 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice to Defendant of Motion for Default Judgment, Memo of Law ISO Default Judgment; Affidavit ISO Default Judgment and accompanying exhibits served on Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC on 03/18/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
March 18, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice to Defendant of Motion for Default Judgment, Memo of Law ISO Default Judgment; Affidavit ISO Default Judgment and accompanying exhibits served on Prodigy Network LLC on 03/18/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/26/2021 at 11:45 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/17/2021) (cf)
March 11, 2021 Filing 18 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Prodigy Network LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC, and Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC.(km)
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Katherine Burghardt Kramer in Support re: #16 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default).(Kramer, Katherine)
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 3/11/2021 (km).
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Katherine Burghardt Kramer dated March 11, 2021 re: Diversity Citizenship Letter. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
March 11, 2021 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang. Related Document Number: #13 ..(Kramer, Katherine) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 3/11/2021 (km).
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Ruby J. Krajick in Support. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Request Clerk's Certificate of Default).(Kramer, Katherine)
March 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Katherine Kramer to RE-FILE Document #14 Proposed Order. Use the event type proposed orders, proposed clerk's certificate of default. The attorney's affidavit or declaration in support needs to be filed as a separate entry (filed under other answers, affidavit or declaration in support of a non-motion). (km)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Maolin Li; Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Maolin Li; Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Prodigy Network LLC served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Maolin Li; Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kramer, Katherine)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC..(jgo)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC..(jgo)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prodigy Network LLC..(jgo)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Katherine Burghardt Kramer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $150,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none;. (jgo)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Katherine Burghardt Kramer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Katherine Burghardt Kramer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Maolin Li; Haiyu Wang; Prodigy Network LLC; Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC; Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
February 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prodigy Network LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kramer, Katherine) Modified on 2/9/2021 (jgo).
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prodigy Network LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC, Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23859796)Document filed by Maolin Li, Haiyu Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li et al v. Prodigy Network LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haiyu Wang
Represented By: Katherine Burghardt Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maolin Li
Represented By: Katherine Burghardt Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Shorewood Domestic Feeder REP Fund LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Network LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Shorewood Master REP Fund LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?