E.W. et al v. New York City Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: E.W.
Defendant: New York City Board of Education, New York City Department of Education and Chancellor Richard Carranza
Case Number: 1:2021cv01140
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #12 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #14 Summons Issued, #13 Summons Issued addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jonathan Pines dated March 30, 2021. The motion for a sixty-day extension of time to answer is GRANTED The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 23, 2021, is adjourned to June 11, 2021, at 3:15 p.m. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/1/2021) (cf) Modified on 4/2/2021 (cf).
April 1, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 6/11/2021 at 03:15 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (cf)
March 30, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #12 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #14 Summons Issued, #13 Summons Issued addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jonathan Pines dated March 30, 2021. Document filed by Chancellor Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education..(Pines, Jonathan)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, April 23, 2021 at 3:15 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 4/23/2021 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/19/2021) (rjm)
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Chancellor Richard Carranza served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. Service was made by email. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself); E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin)
February 16, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City Board of Education served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. Service was made by email. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself); E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City Department of Education served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. Service was made by email. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself); E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin)
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chancellor Richard Carranza..(pc)
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Board of Education..(pc)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(pc)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chancellor Richard Carranza in his Official Capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself), E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin)
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Board of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself), E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself), E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin)
February 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Erin Michelle O'Connor to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Filing court is omitted on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chancellor Richard Carranza in his Official Capacity, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself), E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin) Modified on 2/11/2021 (sj).
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Board of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself), E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin) Modified on 2/11/2021 (sj).
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself), E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin) Modified on 2/11/2021 (sj).
February 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Erin Michelle O'Connor to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney address field is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Erin)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chancellor Richard Carranza in his Official Capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself), E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin) Modified on 2/9/2021 (pc).
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Board of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself), E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin) Modified on 2/9/2021 (pc).
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself), E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin) Modified on 2/9/2021 (pc).
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chancellor Richard Carranza, New York City Board of Education, New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23865483)Document filed by E.W.(on behalf of herself), E.W.(on behalf of her child, Z.K.)..(O'Connor, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.W. et al v. New York City Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Jonathan L. Pines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancellor Richard Carranza
Represented By: Jonathan L. Pines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.W.
Represented By: Erin Michelle O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?