Wheeler v. Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sean Wheeler
Defendant: Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01165
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 4/19/2021. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc...(Malley, Sean)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Sean Malley dated March 19, 2021. Granted. SO ORDERED. Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc. answer due 4/5/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/22/2021) (jca)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Linde Plc for Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc.. Document filed by Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc...(Malley, Sean)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Sean Malley dated March 19, 2021. Document filed by Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc...(Malley, Sean)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc. served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. Service was accepted by Tim Stucky. Document filed by Sean Wheeler..(McNeil, Jillian)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc...(pc)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sean Wheeler..(Baquet, Jessica)
February 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jessica M Baquet to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the Standard A.O. Summons form dated 6/12. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jillian Lee McNeil on behalf of Sean Wheeler..(McNeil, Jillian)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sean Wheeler..(Baquet, Jessica) Modified on 2/11/2021 (sj).
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Baquet, Jessica)
February 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jessica M Baquet to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jessica M Baquet to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
February 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23876777)Document filed by Sean Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons).(Baquet, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praxair Surface Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Sean A Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Wheeler
Represented By: Jessica M Baquet
Represented By: Jillian Lee McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?