Tkatch v. Neos Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Natalia Tkatch
Defendant: Neos Therapeutics, Inc., Greg Robitaille, Aytu BioScience, Inc., Linda M. Szyper, Neutron Acquisition Sub, Inc., John Schmid, James Robinson, Gerald McLaughlin, Alan Heller and Bryant Fong
Case Number: 1:2021cv01187
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Natalia Tkatch, Aytu BioScience, Inc., Bryant Fong, Alan Heller, Gerald McLaughlin, Neos Therapeutics, Inc., Neutron Acquisition Sub, Inc., James Robinson, Greg Robitaille, John Schmid, Linda M. Szyper. Document filed by Natalia Tkatch. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Smith, Evan)
February 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
February 12, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
February 12, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-00874-JSR. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 2-18-2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 12:00pm. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff). (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/11/2021) (rjm)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-00874-JSR; 1:21-cv-00940-VSB; 1:21-cv-00953-JSR. Document filed by Natalia Tkatch..(Smith, Evan)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Evan)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aytu BioScience, Inc., Bryant Fong, Alan Heller, Gerald McLaughlin, Neos Therapeutics, Inc., Neutron Acquisition Sub, Inc., James Robinson, Greg Robitaille, John Schmid, Linda M. Szyper..(jgo)
February 10, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jed S. Rakoff as possibly related to 21-cv-874. (jgo)
February 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
February 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Evan J. Smith. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Natalia Tkatch. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
February 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Evan J. Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct; the Later Filed Case information is incorrect and must contain the information for the newly filed case; if including all Earlier Filed Cases, each Related Case Statement must be filed separately OR the information must be included in one PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
February 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Evan J. Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEOS THERAPEUTICS, INC., ALAN HELLER, BRYANT FONG, GERALD MCLAUGHLIN, JAMES ROBINSON, GREG ROBITAILLE, JOHN SCHMID, LINDA M. SZYPER, AYTU BIOSCIENCE, INC., and NEUTRON ACQUISITION SUB, INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natalia Tkatch..(Smith, Evan)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natalia Tkatch..(Smith, Evan)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-00874; 1:21-cv-00940; 1:21-cv-00953. Document filed by Natalia Tkatch..(Smith, Evan) Modified on 2/10/2021 (jgo).
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Evan) Modified on 2/10/2021 (jgo).
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aytu BioScience, Inc., Bryant Fong, Alan Heller, Gerald McLaughlin, Neos Therapeutics, Inc., Neutron Acquisition Sub, Inc., James Robinson, Greg Robitaille, John Schmid, Linda M. Szyper. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23881303)Document filed by Natalia Tkatch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Certification).(Smith, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tkatch v. Neos Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neos Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Robitaille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aytu BioScience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda M. Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neutron Acquisition Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Tkatch
Represented By: Evan J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?