Walkie Check Productions, LLC v. ViacomCBS Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Walkie Check Productions, LLC
Defendant: BET Productions IV, LLC, ViacomCBS Inc. and Black Entertainment Television LLC doing business as BET Networks
Case Number: 1:2021cv01214
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The initial pre-trial conference scheduled for April 13, 2021, is hereby ADJOURNED to April 27, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. At the scheduled time, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. The parties shall submit a proposed case management plan and a joint pre-conference letter the Thursday before the conference. (See Dkt. #7).. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/15/2021) (nb)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (nb)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Wook Hwang dated March 15, 2021. Document filed by BET Productions IV, LLC, Black Entertainment Television LLC, ViacomCBS Inc...(Hwang, Wook)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. BET Productions IV, LLC served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company. Document filed by Walkie Check Productions, LLC..(Aldous, Kenneth)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. ViacomCBS Inc. served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company. Document filed by Walkie Check Productions, LLC..(Aldous, Kenneth)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Black Entertainment Television LLC served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. Service was accepted by New York State Secretary of State. Document filed by Walkie Check Productions, LLC..(Aldous, Kenneth)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BET Productions IV, LLC, Black Entertainment Television LLC, ViacomCBS Inc...(jgo)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on April 13, 2021, at 4:00 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 4/13/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/22/2021) (nb)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ViacomCBS Inc., Black Entertainment Television LLC d/b/a BET Networks, and BET Productions IV, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Walkie Check Productions, LLC..(Aldous, Kenneth)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(dnh)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Aldous, Kenneth)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kenneth Earl Aldous, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (dnh)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kenneth Earl Aldous, Jr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Black Entertainment Television LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Kenneth Earl Aldous, Jr to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Aldous, Kenneth)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Walkie Check Productions, LLC..(Aldous, Kenneth)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BET Productions IV, LLC, Black Entertainment Television LLC, ViacomCBS Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23893336)Document filed by Walkie Check Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint).(Aldous, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walkie Check Productions, LLC v. ViacomCBS Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walkie Check Productions, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Earl Aldous, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BET Productions IV, LLC
Represented By: Wook J Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Wook J Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Entertainment Television LLC doing business as BET Networks
Represented By: Wook J Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?