Martinez et al v. Fiscardo, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nestor Toribio Ramos and Victor Martinez
Defendant: Ioannis Akriotis, Astrinos Voumvourakis and FISCARDO, INC. doing business as Orion Diner & Grill
Case Number: 1:2021cv01229
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 4/16/2021. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/3/2020) (rpr)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the attorneys for both parties, that the time for the Defendants Fiscardo, Inc. d/b/a Orion Diner & Grill, Astrinos Voumvourakis, and Ioannis Akriotis (the "Defendants") to appear and serve their answer and is hereby extended up to and including April 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #18 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on or before April 30, 2021. filed by Fiscardo, Inc., Astrinos Voumvourakis, Ioannis Akriotis. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/5/2021) (mml)
April 2, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on or before April 30, 2021. Document filed by Ioannis Akriotis, Fiscardo, Inc., Astrinos Voumvourakis..(Lynch, Patricia)
March 30, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia Rose Lynch on behalf of Astrinos Voumvourakis..(Lynch, Patricia)
March 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia Rose Lynch on behalf of Ioannis Akriotis, Fiscardo, Inc...(Lynch, Patricia)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Ioannis Akriotis served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. Service was accepted by Astrinos Voumvourakis. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Victor Martinez; Nestor Toribio Ramos..(Mulholland, Colin)
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Fiscardo, Inc. served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. Service was accepted by Astrinos Voumvourakis. Document filed by Victor Martinez; Nestor Toribio Ramos..(Mulholland, Colin)
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Astrinos Voumvourakis served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. Service was accepted by Astrinos Voumvourakis. Document filed by Victor Martinez; Nestor Toribio Ramos..(Mulholland, Colin)
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ioannis Akriotis..(dnh)
March 10, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ioannis Akriotis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Martinez, Nestor Toribio Ramos..(Mulholland, Colin)
March 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Colin James Mulholland to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF 'To' section contains a typographical error;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fiscardo, Inc...(jgo)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrinos Voumvourakis..(jgo)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ioannis Akriotis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Martinez, Nestor Toribio Ramos..(Mulholland, Colin) Modified on 3/10/2021 (jgo).
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fiscardo, Inc d/b/a Orion Diner & Grill, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Martinez, Nestor Toribio Ramos..(Mulholland, Colin)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Astrinos Voumvourakis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Martinez, Nestor Toribio Ramos..(Mulholland, Colin)
March 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Colin James Mulholland to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Plaintiff's attorney information was omitted on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ioannis Arkiotis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Martinez, Nestor Toribio Ramos..(Mulholland, Colin) Modified on 3/9/2021 (sj).
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fiscardo, Inc. d/b/a Orion Diner & Grill, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Martinez, Nestor Toribio Ramos..(Mulholland, Colin) Modified on 3/9/2021 (sj).
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Astrinos Voumvourakis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Martinez, Nestor Toribio Ramos..(Mulholland, Colin) Modified on 3/9/2021 (sj).
February 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Colin James Mulholland. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: FISCARDO, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mulholland, Colin)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ioannis Akriotis, FISCARDO, INC., Astrinos Voumvourakis. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23899231)Document filed by Victor Martinez, Nestor Toribio Ramos..(Mulholland, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Fiscardo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ioannis Akriotis
Represented By: Patricia Rose Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrinos Voumvourakis
Represented By: Patricia Rose Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISCARDO, INC. doing business as Orion Diner & Grill
Represented By: Patricia Rose Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nestor Toribio Ramos
Represented By: Colin James Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Martinez
Represented By: Colin James Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?