Stovall v. Broadway Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Rose Stovall
Defendant: Wayne-Kent A. Bradshaw, Jack T. Thompson, Erin Selleck, Virgil Roberts, Daniel A. Medina, Robert C. Davidson, Jr., Dutch C. Ross, III and Broadway Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01238
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331sv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Wayne-Kent A. Bradshaw, Broadway Financial Corporation, Robert C. Davidson, Jr., Daniel A. Medina, Virgil Roberts, Dutch C. Ross, III, Erin Selleck, Jack T. Thompson. Document filed by Rose Stovall. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Lifshitz, Joshua)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/13/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981 SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/16/2021) (ks)
February 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
February 16, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
February 16, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-00945-PKC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
February 12, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge P. Kevin Castel as possibly related to 21-cv-945. (jgo)
February 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21cv945. Document filed by Rose Stovall..(Lifshitz, Joshua)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lifshitz, Joshua)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wayne-Kent A. Bradshaw, Broadway Financial Corporation, Robert C. Davidson, Jr., Daniel A. Medina, Virgil Roberts, Dutch C. Ross, III, Erin Selleck, Jack T. Thompson. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23901695)Document filed by Rose Stovall..(Lifshitz, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stovall v. Broadway Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne-Kent A. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack T. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Selleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgil Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Davidson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dutch C. Ross, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Stovall
Represented By: Joshua M. Lifshitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?