Soto v. Nurture, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephanie Soto
Defendant: Nurture, Inc.
Petitioner: Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart and Summer Apicella
Case Number: 1:2021cv01271
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart. Related Document Number: [DE 6]..(Feldman, Lori) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 29, 2021 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Lori G. Feldman in Support re: #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01217-MKV; 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 .. Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 true and correct copy of the Consolidation Order entered on March 15, 2021 in Keeter v. Gerber Products Co., 1:21-cv-00269-LO-TCB (E.D. Va.),, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 true and correct copy of the Plaintiffs Stipulation [and Proposed Order] to Consolidate Actions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and Order entered on March 19, 2021 in Thomas et al. v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Co., 1:21-cv-0133-TJM-CFH (N.D.N.Y.), ECF No. 55, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 true and correct copy of the Order Consolidating Cases entered on March 9, 2021 in Gulkarov v. Plum PBC, No. 21-cv-00913-YGR (N.D. Cal.), ECF No. 14., #4 Exhibit Ex 4 true and correct copy of the Related Case Order entered on March 18, 2021 in Gulkarov v. Plum PBC, No. 21-cv-00913-YGR (N.D. Cal.), ECF No. 22.).(Feldman, Lori)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01217-MKV; 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . . Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart..(Feldman, Lori)
March 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #11 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart. Related Document Number: #6 ..(Feldman, Lori) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01217-MKV; 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . . Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart..(Feldman, Lori)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01217-MKV; 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . Document filed by Summer Apicella, Shannon Fitzgerald, Nicole Stewart..(Feldman, Lori)
March 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #8 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
March 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Lori Gwen Feldman to RE-FILE Document #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01217-MKV; 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
March 7, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-01217-MKV; 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; 7:21-cv-01534; 1:21-cv-01882 . Document filed by Nicole Stewart, Shannon Fitzgerald, Summer Apicella. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Proposed Order).(Feldman, Lori) Modified on 3/18/2021 (ldi).
February 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
February 22, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Victor Marrero is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
February 22, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-01217-MKV. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nurture, Inc...(dnh)
February 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
February 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
February 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nurture, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephanie Soto..(Sheehan, Spencer)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sheehan, Spencer)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nurture, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23909762)Document filed by Stephanie Soto..(Sheehan, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Nurture, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Soto
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurture, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shannon Fitzgerald
Represented By: Lori Gwen Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nicole Stewart
Represented By: Lori Gwen Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Summer Apicella
Represented By: Lori Gwen Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?