Jaiteh Kaba LLC et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jaiteh Kaba LLC and Muhammed Jaiteh
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv01293
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 202
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING PLAINTIFF'S DISQUALIFICATION FROM THE SUPPLEMENTAL NUTRITION ASSISTANCE PROGRAM PENDING FINAL DISPOSITION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED, AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs and Defendant, by their respective undersigned attorneys, that: Defendant agrees to stay its January 15, 2021, decision disqualifying Plaintiffs from participating in SNAP during the pendency of this action (the "Stay"), without prejudice to Defendant's right to move to vacate the Stay upon further case developments or changed circumstances. The Stay will be in effect until the Court vacates the Stay upon Defendant's motion, if any, or issues a final decision in this action; however, the Stay will not remain in effect during the duration of any appeals. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/31/2021) (cf)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by United States of America..(Schwartz, Tara)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Schwartz on behalf of United States of America..(Schwartz, Tara)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America..(jgo)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Muhammed Jaiteh, Jaiteh Kaba LLC..(Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against United States of America. Document filed by Jaiteh Kaba LLC, Muhammed Jaiteh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Final Agency Decision).(Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
February 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jeremy Graham Feigenbaum to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
February 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jeremy Graham Feigenbaum to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Basis of Jurisdiction code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
February 16, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Feigenbaum, Jeremy) Modified on 2/16/2021 (jgo).
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Jaiteh Kaba LLC, Muhammed Jaiteh. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23918955)Document filed by Jaiteh Kaba LLC, Muhammed Jaiteh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Final Agency Decision).(Feigenbaum, Jeremy) Modified on 2/16/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaiteh Kaba LLC et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaiteh Kaba LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Graham Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammed Jaiteh
Represented By: Jeremy Graham Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tara Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?