Santos v. Nuve Miguel Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Margarito Hernandez Santos
Defendant: Nuve Miguel Corp. doing business as Key Foods and Luis H Urgiles
Case Number: 1:2021cv01335
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Referring Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hyun-Baek (Sean) Chung on behalf of Nuve Miguel Corp., Luis H Urgiles..(Chung, Hyun-Baek (Sean))
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Margarito Hernandez Santos..(Seelig, Anne)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Margarito Hernandez Santos..(Lee, C.K.)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). So Ordered. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/17/2021) (js)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nuve Miguel Corp...(jgo)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Luis H Urgiles..(jgo)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney C.K. Lee. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Margarito Hernandez Santos. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Margarito Hernandez Santos..(Lee, C.K.)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Luis H Urgiles, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Margarito Hernandez Santos..(Lee, C.K.)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nuve Miguel Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Margarito Hernandez Santos..(Lee, C.K.)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, C.K.)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nuve Miguel Corp., Luis H Urgiles. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23953005)Document filed by Margarito Hernandez Santos..(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Nuve Miguel Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarito Hernandez Santos
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Represented By: Anne Melissa Seelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuve Miguel Corp. doing business as Key Foods
Represented By: Hyun-Baek (Sean) Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis H Urgiles
Represented By: Hyun-Baek (Sean) Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?