Foster v. Monticello Motor Club Sales and Management et al.
Plaintiff: Joseph Foster
Defendant: Managing Partner Ari Straus and Monticello Motor Club Sales and Management
Case Number: 1:2021cv01400
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monticello Motor Club Sales and Management..(dnh)
March 18, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monticello Motor Club Sales and Management, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Foster..(Ireland, Gary)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Managing Partner Ari Straus..(dnh)
March 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gary Edward Ireland to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; this is not an Amended Summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Monticello Motor Club Sales and Management, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Foster..(Ireland, Gary) Modified on 3/12/2021 (dnh).
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ari Strauss, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Foster..(Ireland, Gary)
March 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Clifford Holland to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Each summons must have the same caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MONTICELLO MOTOR CLUB SALES AND MANAGEMENT, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Foster..(Holland, David) Modified on 3/2/2021 (pc).
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MANAGING PARTNER, ARI STRAUSS, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Foster..(Holland, David) Modified on 3/2/2021 (pc).
February 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gary Edward Ireland to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party names listed on the summons PDF and in the as to docket entry text must appear exactly as it does in the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Edward Ireland on behalf of Joseph Foster..(Ireland, Gary)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monticello Motor Club Sales and Management LLC and Managing Partner Ari Strauss, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Foster..(Holland, David) Modified on 2/26/2021 (dnh).
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Managing Partner Ari Straus, Monticello Motor Club Sales and Management. Document filed by Joseph Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Elizabeth Schubert Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex B - NYS Labor Law Forms).(Holland, David)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Clifford Holland on behalf of Joseph Foster..(Holland, David)
February 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gary Edward Ireland to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
February 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gary Edward Ireland to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monticello Motor Club Sales and Management, and Ari Straus, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Foster..(Ireland, Gary) Modified on 2/24/2021 (jgo).
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Joseph Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A Schubert Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh. B NYS Wage Forms).(Ireland, Gary) Modified on 2/24/2021 (jgo).
February 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gary Edward Ireland to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
February 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gary Edward Ireland. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Monticello Motor Club, Ari Strauss, Joseph Foster. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
February 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gary Edward Ireland. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:5(a); Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201fl; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000; the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
February 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ireland, Gary)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Monticello Motor Club. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23975749)Document filed by Joseph Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A Schubert Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh. B NYS Wage Form).(Ireland, Gary) Modified on 2/18/2021 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Monticello Motor Club Sales and Management et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Managing Partner Ari Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monticello Motor Club Sales and Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Foster
Represented By: Gary Edward Ireland
Represented By: David Clifford Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?