Edwardo v. The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence et al
Plaintiff: Philip Edwardo
Defendant: Louis E Gelineau, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence and St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence
Case Number: 1:2021cv01514
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/6/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/6/2021 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/10/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO ADMIT ROBERT K. TAYLOR PRO HAC VICE granting #24 Motion for Robert K. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 24. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/13/2021) (nb)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO ADMIT EUGENE G. BERNARDO II PRO HAC VICE granting #25 Motion for Eugene G. Bernardo II to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 25. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/13/2021) (nb)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Eugene G. Bernardo II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24384519. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affirmation of William E. Vita, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Eugene G Bernardo II, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Vita, William)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Robert K. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24384473. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affirmation of William Vita, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert K Taylor, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Vita, William)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Robert K. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24384473. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #25 MOTION for Eugene G. Bernardo II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24384519. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Initial Pretrial/Pre-motion Conference held on 4/5/2021. Attorney Lori Gwen Feldman representing Plaintiff present. Attorneys William Edward Vita and Howard A. Merten, Jr. representing Defendants present. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due by 4/30/2021. Defendants' motion to dismiss is due by 5/28/2021; Opposition is due by 6/30/2021; and Reply is due by 7/20/2021. Defendants are to order a copy of today's transcript. (See transcript.) (Court Reporter Raquel Robles) (tn) Modified on 4/8/2021 (tn).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO ADMIT HOWARD A. MERTEN, JR. PRO HAC VICE granting #22 Motion for Howard A. Merten, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 22. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/6/2021) (nb)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Howard A. Merten, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24353540. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Howard A. Merten, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24353540. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. Return Date set for 4/26/2021 at 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affirmation of William Vita, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Howard Merten, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Vita, William)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #20 Letter, filed by The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence, Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/5/2021) (nb)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from William E. Vita dated 4/2/2021 re: 4/6/2021 Preliminary Telephone Conference. Document filed by Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence..(Vita, William)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from William E.Vita dated 4/2/2021 re: April 6, 2021 Preliminary Telephone Conference. Document filed by Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence..(Vita, William)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Lori G. Feldman dated 04/01/2021 re: Response to Defendant's 3/29/2021 Letter seeking pre-motion conference for a Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Philip Edwardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 Decision 201016).(Feldman, Lori)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Lori G. Feldman and William E. Vita dated 03/31/2021 re: Joint Letter in Advance of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Philip Edwardo..(Feldman, Lori)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from William E. Vita dated 03-29-2021 re: Pre-Motion Conference Request. Document filed by Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence..(Vita, William)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Philip Edwardo..(Feldman, Lori)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #10 Letter, filed by The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence, Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' letter dated March 1, 2021, seeking a pre-motion conference to pursue a motion to dismiss (Dkt. #10), and Plaintiff's March 5, 2021 letter in opposition (Dkt. #13). On or by March 22, 2021, Plaintiff shall move to remand, file an amended complaint, or advise the Court that he will stand on his current complaint. Accordingly, Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference is DENIED without prejudice to renew after March 22, 2021., (Amended Pleadings due by 3/22/2021., Motions due by 3/22/2021.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/8/2021) (nb)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Lori G. Feldman dated 03/05/2021 re: Plaintiff Philip Edwardo's Response to Defendants' Letter Dated 3/1/21. Document filed by Philip Edwardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1- Decision 201016).(Feldman, Lori)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Letter extension to respond to Defendant's Letter Request filed by Philip Edwardo. ENDORSEMENT : Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/2/21) (yv)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Lori G. Feldman dated 03/02/2021 re: Plaintiff Phillip Edwardo extension to respond to Defendant's Letter Request. Document filed by Philip Edwardo..(Feldman, Lori)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Vita, William E. dated 3/1/2021 re: Pre-Motion Conference for Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence..(Vita, William)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lori Gwen Feldman on behalf of Philip Edwardo..(Feldman, Lori)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lori Gwen Feldman on behalf of Philip Edwardo..(Feldman, Lori)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on April 6, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/22/2021) (nb)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence..(Vita, William)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Vita, William)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of NEW YORK. Case Number: 950676/2020..Document filed by Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Stipulation, #3 Exhibit Rhode Island Complaint).(Vita, William)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney William Edward Vita to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple Citizenship Defendant codes were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney William Edward Vita to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): State Court number must be listed on the docket entry text. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Edward Vita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Citizenship Plaintiff code none; Citizenship Defendant none; Jury Demand code b (Both);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant);. (jgo)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence..(Vita, William)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Vita, William) Modified on 2/22/2021 (jgo).
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DOCKET ENTRY ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York. Case Number: NOT INDICATED. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24006953).Document filed by Louis E Gelineau, St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence, The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Stipulation, #3 Exhibit C-RI Complaint).(Vita, William) Modified on 2/22/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwardo v. The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Edwardo
Represented By: Lori Gwen Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis E Gelineau
Represented By: William Edward Vita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence
Represented By: William Edward Vita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Anthony's Church Corporation North Providence
Represented By: William Edward Vita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?