Lerner v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cecily Lerner
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Hachette Book Group, Simon & Schuster, Inc. and Penguin Random House LLC
Interested Party: Mary Christopherson-Juve, Michael Wilder, Sandra Wilde, Denise DeLeon and Shannon Fremgen
Case Number: 1:2021cv01561
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337 sc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court concludes that Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP (Hagens Berman) should be appointed, and is hereby appointed, interim lead counsel in these matters. The Court concludes that such appointment will aid in achieving efficiency and economy in what is likely to be expensive and complicated litigation, and that such appointment will enhance fairness to all parties concerned, as well as the proposed classes. (As further set forth herein). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the following motions: Case No. 1:21- cv-351-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 34; Case No. 1:21-cv-00615-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 16; Case No. 1:21-cv-01369-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 25; Case No. 1:21-cv-00421-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 12; Case No. 1:21-cv-01561-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 18; Case No. 1:21-cv-01256-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 18; Case No. 1:21-cv-01130-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No 16. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/15/2021) (nb)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: While Hagens Berman's request for appointment is currently unopposed, the Court wishes to provide an opportunity for interested persons to state their objection, if any, to such appointment. Accordingly, is HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to the appointment of Hagens Berman as interim lead counsel in the above-captioned actions shall be due no later than seven days after the entry of this order; any reply to such opposition shall be due no later than four days after the filing and service of the opposition. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/8/2021) (mro)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/8/2021) (jca)
March 8, 2021 Filing 33 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Georg von Holtzbrinck GmbH & Co. KG for Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC. Document filed by Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(Mitnick, Joel)
March 8, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel M. Mitnick on behalf of Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(Mitnick, Joel)
March 4, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Michael Swenson on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Swenson, Robert)
March 4, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Leonard White on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(White, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2021 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate ViacomCBS Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Simon & Schuster, Inc.. Document filed by Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
March 4, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yehudah Lev Buchweitz on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
March 3, 2021 Filing 27 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bertelsmann SE & Co. KGaA for Penguin Random House LLC. Document filed by Penguin Random House LLC..(Morgenstern, Saul)
March 3, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Margaret Anne Rogers on behalf of Penguin Random House LLC..(Rogers, Margaret)
March 3, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Saul P Morgenstern on behalf of Penguin Random House LLC..(Morgenstern, Saul)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The Court declines to endorse the parties' proposed order. Case No. 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF, Dkt No. 39. The proposed order was not accompanied by a letter as required by Rule 1(F) of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. The Court will await any objections to the proposed consolidation of the cases referenced in that order, in accordance with its February 24th order, Dkt. No. 41. Moreover, the Court does not anticipate that it will establish a briefing schedule before holding a pre-motion conference. The Court construes the parties' proposed order as a request to extend the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaints in Fremgen v. Amazon.com, et al. and each of its related cases. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to those complaints is adjourned sine die pending the resolution of the application to consolidate the cases pending before the Court and the application to appoint lead counsel for those cases. The Court anticipates that a consolidated complaint will be filed within 45 days after an order or orders consolidating the Fremgen, Sacks, Weinberger, Bonilla, Silverman, Cook and Lerner Actions and appointing interim co-lead counsel for the putative plaintiff class. The parties are again directed to review and comply with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
February 24, 2021 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent News Corporation for HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.. Document filed by HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(Lent, Charles)
February 24, 2021 Filing 22 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(Lent, Charles)
February 24, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Scott Lent on behalf of HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(Lent, Charles)
February 24, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
February 24, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
February 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
February 23, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Steve W. Berman in Support re: #18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Unopposed Motion to Appoint Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Proposed Class.. Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Berman, Steve)
February 23, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Unopposed Motion to Appoint Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Proposed Class. . Document filed by Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Shannon Fremgen, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder..(Berman, Steve)
February 23, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Unopposed Motion to Appoint Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Proposed Class. Document filed by Shannon Fremgen, Mary Christopherson-Juve, Denise DeLeon, Sandra Wilde, Michael Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Berman, Steve)
February 23, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey J. Corrigan on behalf of Cecily Lerner..(Corrigan, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simon & Schuster, Inc...(jgo)
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Penguin Random House LLC..(jgo)
February 23, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(jgo)
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(jgo)
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hachette Book Group..(jgo)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.com, Inc...(jgo)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hachette Book Group waiver sent on 2/22/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. Document filed by Cecily Lerner..(Linkh, Gregory)
February 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Cecily Lerner. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
February 23, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 21-cv-351. (jgo)
February 23, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
February 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Class Action code n (No Class Action Alleged); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Class Action code has been modified to y (Class Action Alleged); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-00351. Document filed by Cecily Lerner..(Linkh, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simon & Schuster, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cecily Lerner..(Linkh, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Penguin Random House LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cecily Lerner..(Linkh, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cecily Lerner..(Linkh, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harpercollins Publishers L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cecily Lerner..(Linkh, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hachette Book Group, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cecily Lerner..(Linkh, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cecily Lerner..(Linkh, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linkh, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc., Hachette Book Group, HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Penguin Random House LLC, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24025371)Document filed by Cecily Lerner..(Linkh, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lerner v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.
Represented By: Charles Scott Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC
Represented By: Joel M. Mitnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Represented By: Yehudah Lev Buchweitz
Represented By: Robert Michael Swenson
Represented By: Jeffrey Leonard White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Random House LLC
Represented By: Margaret Anne Rogers
Represented By: Saul P Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mary Christopherson-Juve
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael Wilder
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sandra Wilde
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Denise DeLeon
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shannon Fremgen
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecily Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Corrigan
Represented By: Gregory Bradley Linkh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?