Molo Design, Ltd. v. Chanel, Inc.
Plaintiff: Molo Design, Ltd.
Defendant: Chanel, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01578
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Motions due by 10/25/2021. Responses due by 11/30/2021, Replies due by 12/9/2021. This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 6/10/2022. All Fact Discovery due by 3/11/2022. All Expert Discovery due by 6/10/2022. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/22/2021) (ama)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #25 Letter filed by Molo Design, Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 30, 2021 is canceled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/22/2021) (ama)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Conor Civins dated April 22, 2021 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Molo Design, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Case Management Order).(Civins, Conor)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Molo Design, Ltd.. Document filed by Chanel, Inc...(Ewing, Bruce)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Chanel, Inc...(Ewing, Bruce)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR GEOFFREY M. GODFREY: granting #21 Motion for Geoffrey M. Godfrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERD that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/31/2021) (js)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Geoffrey M. Godfrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Geoffrey M. Godfrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Godfrey, Geoffrey)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Geoffrey M. Godfrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24268059. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Godfrey, Geoffrey) Modified on 3/17/2021 (vba).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, and to request an adjournment of the Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Bruce R. Ewing dated March 17, 2021. Application GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is extended to April 19, 2021. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 2, 2021 is adjourned to April 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The parties' joint letter and proposed case management plan is due by April 22, 2021. The parties must appear for the conference by dialing 888-363-4749, using the access code 3121171 and the security code 1578. Chanel, Inc. answer due 4/19/2021 (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/17/2021) (cf)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, and to request an adjournment of the Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Bruce R. Ewing dated March 17, 2021. Document filed by Chanel, Inc...(Ewing, Bruce)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR SHANNON L. BJORKLUND: granting #16 Motion for Shannon L. Bjorklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERD that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/17/2021) (js) Modified on 3/17/2021 (js).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #20 MOTION for Geoffrey M. Godfrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24268059. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from ALL STATES LISTED; we only accept certificates from supreme court.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (cf)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Shannon L. Bjorklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24258660. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Bjorklund, Shannon)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for Jared Schuettenhelm to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/16/2021) (cf)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Jared Schuettenhelm to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24255168. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Shannon L. Bjorklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24258660. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Jared Schuettenhelm to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24255168. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Molo Design, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Washington Certificate of Good Standing, #3 California Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Schuettenhelm, Jared)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Roy Millar Ewing on behalf of Chanel, Inc...(Ewing, Bruce)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Chanel, Inc. served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Molo Design, Ltd...(Condro, Grace)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Conor M. Civins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/3/2021) (cf)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Conor M. Civins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Molo Design, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Civins, Conor)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Conor M. Civins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24138483. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Molo Design, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing).(Civins, Conor) Modified on 3/1/2021 (wb).
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 MOTION for Conor M. Civins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24138483. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas; missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Conor M. Civins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on April 2, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888- 363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 0759. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 4/2/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/25/2021) (js)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chanel, Inc...(pc)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Molo Design, Ltd...(Condro, Grace)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chanel, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Molo Design, Ltd...(Condro, Grace)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Condro, Grace)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Condro, Grace)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chanel, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-24031830)Document filed by Molo Design, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 7,866,366, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 8,561,666, #3 Exhibit C - US Patent No. 9,686,161, #4 Exhibit D - US Patent No. 9,797,134).(Condro, Grace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molo Design, Ltd. v. Chanel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Godfrey
Represented By: Bruce Roy Millar Ewing
Represented By: Shannon Lynne Bjorklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molo Design, Ltd.
Represented By: Grace Elizabeth Condro
Represented By: Conor Civins
Represented By: Jared Schuettenhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?