Castillo v. Z Deli Grocery V Corp, et al
Plaintiff: Enrique Castillo
Defendant: Z Deli Grocery V Corp doing business as Z Grill, Mohammed Ziad and Ali Esmael Ziad
Case Number: 1:2021cv01744
Filed: February 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 6/17/2021 at 10:00 AM through video conference. (sb)
April 8, 2021 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 5/10/2021.(ah)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 4/16/2021. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/10/2019) (rpr)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above captioned matter is hereby extended to 30 days from the date this Stipulation is so ordered by the Court. There has been no previous request for an extension of time. Defendants reserve all defenses to this action,except waive as to service of the initial Complaint. SO ORDERED., Motions terminated: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Z Deli Grocery V Corp, Ali Esmael Ziad, Mohammed Ziad. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/30/2021) (ama)
March 25, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Document filed by Ali Esmael Ziad, Z Deli Grocery V Corp, Mohammed Ziad..(Chong, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Z Deli Grocery V Corp..(Chong, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael K. Chong on behalf of Ali Esmael Ziad, Z Deli Grocery V Corp, Mohammed Ziad..(Chong, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Z Deli Grocery V Corp served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Enrique Castillo..(Aronauer, Jacob)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/1/2021) (ks)
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ali Esmael Ziad. (sj)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ali Esmael Ziad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Enrique Castillo..(Aronauer, Jacob)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mohammed Ziad..(dnh)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Z Deli Grocery V Corp..(dnh)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mohammed Ziad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Enrique Castillo..(Aronauer, Jacob)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Z Deli Grocery V Corp, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Enrique Castillo..(Aronauer, Jacob)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ali Small Ziad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Enrique Castillo..(Aronauer, Jacob) Modified on 3/1/2021 (dnh).
March 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacob Aronauer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Z Deli Grocery V Corp d/b/a Z Grill, Ali E-mail Ziad, Mohammed Ziad. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; alias party was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
March 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jacob Aronauer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act; County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act; the County code has been modified to Queens. (dnh)
March 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jacob Aronauer to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the party name listed in the as to docket entry text contains a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
March 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
February 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Aronauer, Jacob)
February 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Z Deli Grocery V Corp d/b/a Z Grill, Ali E-mail Ziad, Mohammed Ziad. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24131985)Document filed by Enrique Castillo..(Aronauer, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Z Deli Grocery V Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Castillo
Represented By: Jacob Aronauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z Deli Grocery V Corp doing business as Z Grill
Represented By: Michael K. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Ziad
Represented By: Michael K. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Esmael Ziad
Represented By: Michael K. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?