Gerasimov v. Amalgamated Housing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Boris Gerasimov
Defendant: Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley Law Firm, Norris McLaughlin & Marcus Law Firm and Amalgamated Housing Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01760
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 vc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 21 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley Law Firm. Responses due by 6/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mehreen Hayat in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A: SDNY Complaint, #3 Exhibit B: Feb. 26, 2019 Order, #4 Exhibit C: May 2, 2019 Order, #5 Exhibit D: May 8, 2020 Order, #6 Exhibit E: 2012 Housing Court Order, #7 Exhibit F: 2013 Housing Court Order, #8 Exhibit G: 2017 Housing Court Order, #9 Exhibit H: 2018 Housing Court Order, #10 Exhibit I: Supreme Court Complaint, #11 Exhibit J: Feb. 4, 2020 Order, #12 Notice to Pro Se, #13 Memorandum of Law in support of Motion to Dismiss).(Hayat, Mehreen)
April 23, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion served on Boris Gerasimov & Dean M. Roberts on 4/23/21. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Amalgamated Housing Corporation..(Rejan, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Amalgamated Housing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Decision/Order, #4 Exhibit Decision/Order, #5 Exhibit Decision/Order, #6 Exhibit Decision/Order, #7 Exhibit Decision, #8 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #9 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, #10 Memorandum of Law).(Rejan, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2021 Mailed a copy of 18 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document to Boris Gerasimov at 3985 Gouverneur Ave., Apt. 11B, Bronx, NY 10463. (kh)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendant Morris Duffy shall file its anticipated motion to dismiss no later than April 30, 2021. No pre-motion letter is required. Plaintiff may file one consolidated opposition brief by June 1, 2021. Defendants may each file a reply brief by June 15, 2021. The Clerk of Court is requested to mail a copy of this order to the pro se plaintiff. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) Copies of Notice of Electronic Filing To Be Mailed By Clerks Office. (Netburn, Sarah) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
April 5, 2021 Filing 17 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Mehreen dated April 5, 2021. Document filed by Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley Law Firm..(Hayat, Mehreen)
March 25, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shari Debra Sckolnick on behalf of Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley Law Firm..(Sckolnick, Shari)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley Law Firm shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than April 30, 2021. The Court requests the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) Copies of Notice of Electronic Filing To Be Mailed By Clerks Office. (Netburn, Sarah) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant Amalgamated Housing Corporation shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than April 30, 2021. The Court does not require a premotion conference for the filing of the Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss. The Court requests the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) Copies of Notice of Electronic Filing To Be Mailed By Clerks Office. (Netburn, Sarah) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 22, 2021 Mailed a copy of 14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, 15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Boris Gerasimov at 3985 Gouverneur Ave., Apt. 11B, Bronx, NY 10463. (kh)
March 19, 2021 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Mehreen dated March 19, 2021. Document filed by Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley Law Firm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation).(Hayat, Mehreen)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/19/2021) (rjm)
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jeffrey N. Rejan dated March 19, 2021. Document filed by Amalgamated Housing Corporation..(Rejan, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Neil Rejan on behalf of Amalgamated Housing Corporation..(Rejan, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mehreen Hayat on behalf of Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley Law Firm..(Hayat, Mehreen)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Norris McLaughlin & Marcus Law Firm; served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. Service was made by FedEX #784267009005. Document filed by Boris Gerasimov. (sc)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Amalgamated Housing Corporation; served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. Service was accepted by Mrs. Karen Armstrong, AHC Receptionist. Document filed by Boris Gerasimov. (sc)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley Law Firm, served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. Service was made by FedEX #484266972472. Document filed by Boris Gerasimov. (sc)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley Law Firm. (sac)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Norris McLaughlin & Marcus Law Firm. (sac)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amalgamated Housing Corporation. (sac)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amalgamated Housing Corporation, Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley Law Firm, Norris McLaughlin & Marcus Law Firm. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465401274647) Document filed by Boris Gerasimov. (sac)
March 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
March 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerasimov v. Amalgamated Housing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris Gerasimov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley Law Firm
Represented By: Mehreen Hayat
Represented By: Shari Debra Sckolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norris McLaughlin & Marcus Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amalgamated Housing Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Neil Rejan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?