Nagpal v. Kendall et al
Plaintiff: Twinkle Nagpal
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director Sarah Kendall, Senior Official Tracy Renaud, Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, Alejandro Mayorkas and Sarah Kendall
Case Number: 1:2021cv01777
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus, served. Sarah Kendall served on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021; Tracy Renaud served on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Twinkle Nagpal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proof of service Kendall, #2 Exhibit B - proof of service Renaud, #3 Exhibit C - proof of service Mayorkas, #4 Exhibit D - proof of service USCIS, #5 Exhibit E - proof of service DHS, #6 Exhibit F - proof of service USAO, #7 Exhibit G - proof of service USAG, #8 Exhibit H - certified mail receipts).(Reingold, Steven)
March 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Sarah Kendall, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security..(Byars, Michael)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/9/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/3/2021) (ks)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security..(dnh)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(dnh)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas..(dnh)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tracy Renaud..(dnh)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sarah Kendall..(dnh)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Twinkle Nagpal..(Reingold, Steven)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Twinkle Nagpal..(Reingold, Steven)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security, in his official capacity, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Twinkle Nagpal..(Reingold, Steven)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tracy Renaud, Senior Official Performing the Duties of Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, in her official capacity, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Twinkle Nagpal..(Reingold, Steven)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sarah Kendall, Director of the Immigrant Investor Program Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, in her official capacity, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Twinkle Nagpal..(Reingold, Steven)
March 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven C. Reingold. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sarah Kendall, Tracy Renaud and Alejandro Mayorkas. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (gp)
March 3, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
March 3, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
March 3, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reingold, Steven)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Sarah Kendall, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24147719).Document filed by Twinkle Nagpal..(Reingold, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagpal v. Kendall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Sarah Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Official Tracy Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Kendall
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twinkle Nagpal
Represented By: Steven C. Reingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?