Sanchez v. Browning
Plaintiff: Cristian Sanchez
Defendant: Browning
Case Number: 1:2021cv01814
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Browning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DOJ Letter, #2 Exhibit B - DOJ July 19th Letter, #3 Exhibit C - DOJ September 4th Letter).(Kirby, Sean)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BWA, Inc., Corporate Parent Browning S.A., Corporate Parent Herstal, S.A. for Browning. Document filed by Browning..(Kirby, Sean)
March 31, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 12:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO-ORDERED STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff and Defendant that Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above captioned action is extended from April 7, 2021 to and including April 30, 2021. SO ORDERED., Browning answer due 4/30/2021., Motions terminated: #5 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joseph H. Mizrahi and Sean J. Kirby dated March 26, 2021. filed by Browning. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/30/2021) (ks)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joseph H. Mizrahi and Sean J. Kirby dated March 26, 2021. Document filed by Browning..(Kirby, Sean)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Browning..(jgo)
March 3, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 3, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 3, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Browning, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Browning. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24156711)Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Browning
Represented By: Sean Joseph Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Sanchez
Represented By: Joseph H Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?