Jaquez v. Sunrise Global Logistics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ramon Jaquez
Defendant: Sunrise Global Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01949
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DISMISSED as moot, and all conferences are CANCELLED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/28/2021) (ks)
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement And Request For 60-Days To File Dismissal Documents. Document filed by Ramon Jaquez..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, if Plaintiff is in communication with Defendant, the parties shall file the joint letter and proposed case management plan as soon as possible and no later than noon on April 28, 2021. If Defendant refuses to cooperate in the preparation of these documents, Plaintiff shall prepare and file them. If Plaintiff is not in communication with Defendant, as soon as possible and no later than noon on April 28, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a letter (i) summarizing his efforts to contact Defendant; (ii) requesting adjournment of the initial pretrial conference and (iii) explaining why he has failed to timely respond to the Court's orders. Plaintiff and his counsel are reminded again that compliance with Court-ordered deadlines is not optional. Further non-compliance will result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/27/2021) (nb)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, if Plaintiff is in communication with Defendant, the parties shall file the joint letter and proposed case management plan as soon as possible and no later than noon on April 26, 2021. If Defendant refuses to cooperate in the preparation of these documents, Plaintiff shall prepare and file them. If Plaintiff is not in communication with Defendant, as soon as possible and no later than noon on April 26, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a letter (i) summarizing his efforts to contact Defendant and (ii) requesting adjournment of the initial pretrial conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/23/2021) (cf)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Sunrise Global Logistics, Inc. served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. Service was accepted by Nikki Nelson, designated by law to accept service on behalf of Sunrise Global Logistics, Inc.. Document filed by Ramon Jaquez..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/11/2021) (jca)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sunrise Global Logistics, Inc...(dnh)
March 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sunrise Global Logistics, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ramon Jaquez..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sunrise Global Logistics, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number CNYSDC-24213112)Document filed by Ramon Jaquez..(Zelman, Yitzchak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaquez v. Sunrise Global Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Jaquez
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Global Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?