Bonner v. Department of Defense
Plaintiff: Raymond Bonner
Defendant: Department of Defense and United States Department of Defense
Case Number: 1:2021cv01955
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Department of Defense..(Normand, Sarah)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Kendrick Connolly on behalf of United States Department of Defense..(Connolly, Christopher)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Sheive Normand on behalf of United States Department of Defense..(Normand, Sarah)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. United States Department of Defense served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Schulz, David)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the initial pretrial conference will be held telephonically. Prior to the date of the conference, counsel for all parties shall register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures for Electronic Case Filing, and as further set forth in this order. Initial Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948 The parties shall use a landline if one is available. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/10/2021) (jwh)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Defense..(jgo)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Schulz, David)
March 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David A. Schulz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the party name listed in the 'To' section of the summons PDF must appear exactly as it does in the pleading caption. Do not abbreviate party names. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
March 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David A. Schulz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Department of Defense. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
March 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David A. Schulz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
March 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schulz, David)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Schulz, David) Modified on 3/8/2021 (dnh).
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Defense. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24213335)Document filed by Raymond Bonner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PRB FOIA Request, #2 Exhibit PRB Request Expedited Denial, #3 Exhibit PRB Request Administrative Appeal, #4 Exhibit CSRT FOIA Request).(Schulz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner v. Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Christopher Kendrick Connolly
Represented By: Sarah Sheive Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Bonner
Represented By: David A. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?