United States of America v. EZ Lynk, SEZC et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: THOMAS WOOD, BRADLEY GINTZ, PRESTIGE WORLDWIDE SEZC and EZ LYNK, SEZC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01986
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 23 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Monica P. Folch dated April 26, 2021 re: Rule 26(f) Conference and Discovery Plan Report. Document filed by United States of America..(Folch, Monica)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. SO ORDERED. Answer due May 14, 2021. EZ Lynk, SEZC answer due 5/14/2021; Bradley Gintz answer due 5/14/2021; Prestige Worldwide SEZC answer due 5/14/2021; Thomas Wood answer due 5/14/2021. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/1/2021) (mro)
March 31, 2021 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Thomas Wood served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021. Service was accepted by Thomas Wood. Document filed by United States of America..(Jude, Jennifer)
March 30, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Hal S. Shaftel dated March 30, 2021. Document filed by EZ Lynk, SEZC, Bradley Gintz, Prestige Worldwide SEZC, Thomas Wood..(Shaftel, Harold)
March 30, 2021 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by EZ Lynk, SEZC..(Kirschbaum, Adam)
March 30, 2021 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Prestige Worldwide SEZC..(Kirschbaum, Adam)
March 30, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Kirschbaum on behalf of EZ Lynk, SEZC, Bradley Gintz, Prestige Worldwide SEZC, Thomas Wood..(Kirschbaum, Adam)
March 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harold S. Shaftel on behalf of EZ Lynk, SEZC, Bradley Gintz, Prestige Worldwide SEZC, Thomas Wood..(Shaftel, Harold)
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Bradley Gintz served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. Service was accepted by Bradley Gintz. Document filed by United States of America..(Jude, Jennifer)
March 17, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Prestige Worldwide SEZC served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. Service was accepted by Bradley Gintz, Corporate Officer. Document filed by United States of America..(Jude, Jennifer)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. EZ Lynk, SEZC served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. Service was accepted by Bradley Gintz, Corporate Officer. Document filed by United States of America..(Jude, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by United States of America.(Jude, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Wood. (sj)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bradley Gintz. (sj)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prestige Worldwide SEZC. (sj)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to EZ Lynk, SEZC. (sj)
March 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Monica Pilar Folch. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff). (sj)
March 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Monica Pilar Folch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All Parties. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
March 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Wood, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Jude, Jennifer)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bradley Gintz, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Jude, Jennifer)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prestige Worldwide, SEZC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Jude, Jennifer)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EZ Lynk, SEZC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Jude, Jennifer)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ann Jude on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Jude, Jennifer)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Folch, Monica)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EZ LYNK, SEZC, BRADLEY GINTZ, PRESTIGE WORLDWIDE SEZC, THOMAS WOOD. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Folch, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. EZ Lynk, SEZC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS WOOD
Represented By: Harold S. Shaftel
Represented By: Adam Kirschbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY GINTZ
Represented By: Harold S. Shaftel
Represented By: Adam Kirschbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESTIGE WORLDWIDE SEZC
Represented By: Harold S. Shaftel
Represented By: Adam Kirschbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZ LYNK, SEZC
Represented By: Harold S. Shaftel
Represented By: Adam Kirschbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Jude
Represented By: Monica Pilar Folch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?