Benchmark Investments, Inc. v. Shiftpixy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Benchmark Investments, Inc. doing business as Kingswood Capital Markets
Defendant: Shiftpixy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01988
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that this case has been settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. All scheduled conferences are hereby adjourned. Within the thirty-day period provided for in this Order, the parties may submit to the Court their own Stipulation of Dismissal for the Court to So Order. Pursuant to Rule 5.A. of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless the terms of the agreement are made part of the public record. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/1/2021) (va)
April 29, 2021 Filing 17 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Action Pending Performance of Settlement Agreement (Corrected) addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Martin E. Karlinsky dated April 29, 2021. Document filed by Shiftpixy, Inc...(Karlinsky, Martin)
April 29, 2021 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Action Pending Performance of Settlement Agreement addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Martin E. Karlinsky dated April 29, 2021. Document filed by Shiftpixy, Inc...(Karlinsky, Martin)
April 8, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Shiftpixy, Inc...(Karlinsky, Martin)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Martin E. Karlinsky dated March 24, 2021. Document filed by Shiftpixy, Inc. So ordered. (Shiftpixy, Inc. answer due 4/9/2021.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/24/2021) (rjm)
March 24, 2021 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Martin E. Karlinsky dated March 24, 2021. Document filed by Shiftpixy, Inc...(Karlinsky, Martin)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, May 28, 2021 at 3:30 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 5/28/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/17/2021) (rjm)
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kingswood US, LLC, Other Affiliate Kingswood Holdings Limited for Benchmark Investments, Inc.. Document filed by Benchmark Investments, Inc...(Herskovits, Robert)
March 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert L. Herskovits to RE-FILE Document #10 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kingswood US, LLC for Benchmark Investments, Inc.. Document filed by Benchmark Investments, Inc...(Herskovits, Robert) Modified on 3/12/2021 (lb).
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Shiftpixy, Inc...(Karlinsky, Martin)
March 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert L. Herskovits to RE-FILE Document #6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Shiftpixy, Inc. served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez, Security, CT Corp.. Document filed by Benchmark Investments, Inc...(Allgor, Joseph)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin E Karlinsky on behalf of Shiftpixy, Inc...(Karlinsky, Martin)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Benchmark Investments, Inc...(Herskovits, Robert) Modified on 3/11/2021 (lb).
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert L. Herskovits on behalf of Benchmark Investments, Inc...(Herskovits, Robert)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shiftpixy, Inc...(dnh)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ShiftPixy, Inc., re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Benchmark Investments, Inc...(Allgor, Joseph)
March 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Peter Allgor. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Shiftpixy, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24220147)Document filed by Benchmark Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SPAC 1 Engagement Letter, #2 Exhibit B - SPAC 2 Engagement Letter, #3 Exhibit C - SPAC 3 Engagement Letter, #4 Exhibit D - SPAC 4 Engagement Letter, #5 Exhibit E - 2-5-21 Ltr Tucker to Absher, #6 Exhibit F - 2-5-21 Ltr Gans to Tucker).(Allgor, Joseph)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Allgor, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benchmark Investments, Inc. v. Shiftpixy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiftpixy, Inc.
Represented By: Martin E Karlinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benchmark Investments, Inc. doing business as Kingswood Capital Markets
Represented By: Joseph Peter Allgor
Represented By: Robert L. Herskovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?